Original Case: 2:10-cv-03375

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:11-cv-55754
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:May 10, 2011
Terminated:Jan 23, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 3:34 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By
H. Thomas Byron III
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Michael Raab
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Karen P. Seifert
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Michael Raab
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Karen P. Seifert
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff
LEONARD WEINGLASS, ESQ.
Represented By
Carlos R. Holguin
CENTER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS & CONSTITUTIONAL LAW
contact info
Peter Anthony Schey
CENTER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS & CONSTITUTIONAL LAW
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CENTER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW
Represented By
Carlos R. Holguin
CENTER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS & CONSTITUTIONAL LAW
contact info
Peter Anthony Schey
CENTER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS & CONSTITUTIONAL LAW
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2016 2:47 AM PST
Tuesday, May 10, 2011
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/17/2011. Transcript ordered by 06/06/2011. Transcript due 09/06/2011. Appellant Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law opening brief due 10/17/2011. Appellee National Aeronautics and Space Administration and Appellee National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency answering brief due 11/16/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7747021] (BG) [Entered: 05/10/2011 01:05 PM]
Related: [-]