Emalange v. Safeco Insurance
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00854 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 10, 2018 12:34 AM PST |
Defendant
Safeco Insurance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frida Emalange
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago |
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
3 - Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 09/17 1:41 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice and without costs re parties'9 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/14 10:05 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal by parties (Smith, Morgan) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM)
Mon 08/06 1:19 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *3 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 9/4/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/12/2018, Motions due by 1/11/2019, Discovery completed by 2/11/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/26/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/13/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/5/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/5/2019. (LC) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Joint Status Report
Thu 08/02 3:09 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Smith, Morgan) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/25 3:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Safeco Insurance.(Smith, Morgan) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Thu 06/21 1:46 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/26/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Thu 06/14 2:03 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from Whatcom County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/14 1:52 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/13 12:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First National Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance for First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance (Smith, Morgan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Wed 06/13 12:17 PM
DECLARATION of Morgan E. Smith in Support of Removal to Federal Court re1 Notice of Removal by Defendants First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance(Smith, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-E | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/13 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whatcom County, case number 18 2-00555 37; , filed by First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco Insurance.(Smith, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |