Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-32435

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barbara J Houser
Case #: 3:18-ap-03185
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2018
Terminated:Feb 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Plant Source, Inc.
Represented By
Plant Source, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane G Reed, as Chapter 7 Trustee of BFN Operations LLC
Represented By
David W. Elmquist
Reed & Elmquist, P.C.
contact info
Brigette G. McGrath
Ask, LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, February 04, 2019
court Close adversary case Mon 02/04 8:36 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3185 closed (Ward, J)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 20, 2019
16 16 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 01/20 11:30 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation and Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding with prejudice (related document14 ) Entered on 1/18/2019. (Blanco, J.)
Friday, January 18, 2019
15 15 order Dismiss adversary proceeding Fri 01/18 2:30 PM
Stipulation and Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding with prejudice Related [+] Entered on 1/18/2019. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
14 14 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Wed 01/16 12:02 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (approve stipulation and order of dismissal) filed by Plaintiff Diane G Reed (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
13 13 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 12/19 11:37 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order denying motion to appear pro hac vice of Chandra Kiamilev (related document6 ) Entered on 12/17/2018. (Blanco, J.)
Monday, December 17, 2018
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 12/17 9:01 AM
Order denying motion to appear pro hac vice of Chandra Kiamilev Related [+] Entered on 12/17/2018. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, August 16, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of service Thu 08/16 2:08 PM
Certificate of service re: Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Diane G Reed Related [+]. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 9 Order on motion to continue hearing
Friday, August 10, 2018
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 08/10 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/10/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Agreed Scheduling order (related document8 ) (related documents Complaint) Trial Docket Call date set for 3/5/2019 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 8/8/2018. (Blanco, J.)
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
9 9 order Continue Wed 08/08 10:47 AM
Agreed Scheduling order Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 3/5/2019 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 8/8/2018. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 8 Complaint
Friday, August 03, 2018
8 8 motion Continue Fri 08/03 3:05 PM
Agreed Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] and Entry of Agreed Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Diane G Reed (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to complaint Wed 08/01 4:10 PM
Answer to complaint filed by Plant Source, Inc.. (Norman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 08/01 4:03 PM
Motion to appear pro hac vice for Chandra Kiamilev. Fee Amount $25 filed by Defendant Plant Source, Inc. (Norman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 08/01 4:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice 18-03185 bjh) [motion,mprohac] ( 25.00). Receipt number 25492173, amount $ 25.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 07/10 10:13 AM
Stipulation by Diane G Reed and Defendant. filed by Plaintiff Diane G Reed Related [+]. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 Summons issued
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Wed 06/20 2:17 PM
Summons service executed on Plant Source, Inc. 6/19/2018 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 06/14 1:47 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 11/6/2018 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 6/14/2018 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diane G Reed
2 2 court Summons issued Thu 06/14 1:44 PM
Summons issued on Plant Source, Inc. Answer Due 7/16/2018 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/13 1:43 PM
Adversary case 18-03185 Complaint by Diane G Reed against Plant Source, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. 14. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet