Lawrence v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Referred: | J Richard Creatura |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05479 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion
Fri 04/19 10:54 AM
ORDER granting parties'16 Stipulated Motion for EAJA fees: the Court awards Plaintiff $6,048.00 in attorneys fees, subject to any offset allowed under the Treasury Offset Program. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 04/12 4:31 PM
Stipulated MOTION For EAJA Fees , filed by Plaintiff Haley J Lawrence. Noting Date 4/26/2019, (Oliver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David Oliver, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Haley Lawrence, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment by Court
Fri 01/25 1:30 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Court has Ordered that this matter be REVERSED and REMANDED pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) to the Acting Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this Report and Recommendation. JUDGMENT should be for PLAINTIFF and the case should be closed. (LW) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Fri 01/25 1:21 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts the13 Report and Recommendation. The matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for further consideration. Judgment is for Plaintiff and the case should be closed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 01/11 4:29 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura re4 Complaint. Noting Date: 1/25/2019. (GMR) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief - Reply
Tue 10/30 4:39 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Haley J Lawrence. (Oliver, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief - Responsive
Tue 10/16 5:23 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re10 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 09/18 3:16 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Haley J Lawrence (Oliver, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
JRC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Tue 08/21 1:56 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 8/20/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 9/18/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/16/2018, Reply Brief due by 10/30/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (apb) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 08/20 6:30 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 07/14 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Tue 06/19 3:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Haley J Lawrence. (Oliver, David) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/15 12:13 PM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summons to Attorney General, D.C. attached as main document).(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Regional Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to US Attorney Seattle | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summonses as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Haley J Lawrence.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/15 12:07 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/15 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez and referred to Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/15 9:07 AM
Judge J Richard Creatura added. (CMG) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/14 11:21 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Haley J Lawrence.(Oliver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |