Rinehart v. Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd.
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | David W Christel |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05483 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 12:49 AM PST |
Defendant
Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Rinehart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 07/09 10:59 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re20 Stipulation of dismissal filed by Joel Rinehart by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/08 4:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by parties (Beard, James) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Thu 06/27 12:26 PM
Parties contacted court and advised a settlement has been reached. Notice of dismissal to be filed. (KEB) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/14 10:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION AND AMENDING TRIAL, PRETRIAL DATES, AND ORDERING MEDIATION re18 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Time for Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines filed by Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd., by Judge David W. Christel. 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/3/2020, Discovery completed by 12/9/2019, Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Report due by 10/3/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2019, Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2020, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/13/2020, Jury Trial is set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Wed 03/13 11:55 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Time for Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines , filed by Defendant Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd.. Noting Date 3/13/2019, (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/24 1:53 PM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. No declination forms received by deadline. (KEB) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
DWC Scheduling Order and Mediation Under LR 39.1(c)
Fri 08/03 3:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER and MEDIATION UNDER LR 39.1(c); Length of Trial: *5*. Jury Trial is set for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/3/2019, Discovery completed by 6/7/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/3/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/3/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/3/2019, Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/13/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/13/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. by Judge David W. Christel. (LL) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 07/24 1:38 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Plaintiff Joel Rinehart.(Beard, James) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice to Filer- Consent
Mon 07/16 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re6 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/21 2:59 PM
ORDER on the12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zachary T Berne for Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd., by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (GMR) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 06/20 11:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd.. (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 10:31 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary T. Berne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5364146 (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/15 2:56 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd. (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 06/15 2:03 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Joel Rinehart (Beard, James) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/15 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Milan Beard on behalf of Plaintiff Joel Rinehart. (Beard, James) |
|
8 | 8
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Fri 06/15 11:46 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
7 | 7
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges
Fri 06/15 11:44 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/30/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/6/2018, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent Letter & Form
Fri 06/15 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 8/15/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/15 10:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re4 Notice to Filer,1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd.. (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Notice to Filer
Fri 06/15 10:20 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re the1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency: Jury Demand and Civil Cover Sheet ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Fri 06/15 9:23 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/15 9:23 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (CMG) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Fri 06/15 10:52 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/22/2018. (CMG) |
||
utility
Notice to Filer- Consent
Fri 06/15 11:43 AM
***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re6 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB) |
||
motion
Motion Calendar
Fri 06/15 11:45 AM
Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/13/2018. (KEB) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Thu 06/14 2:21 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd. (Lempriere, Philip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/14 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18 2-07839 9; , filed by Evergreen Marine (UK) Ltd..(Lempriere, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |