Brown v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | David W Christel |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05485 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 10/23 2:28 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge David W. Christel.(KEB) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Declaration
Thu 10/22 11:03 AM
DECLARATION of Elie Halpern filed by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown re24 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (Halpern, Elie) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 10/22 11:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown. Noting Date 10/22/2020, (Halpern, Elie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B - Retainer Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C - EAJA Time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D - EAJA Order | ||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 07/01 2:30 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT FEES AND EXPENSES re22 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge David W. Christel.(KEB) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 06/28 11:00 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown. Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Halpern, Elie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Costs, | ||
Att: 4 Itemized Times, | ||
Att: 5 Retainer Agreement | ||
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment by Court
Fri 04/05 9:35 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Kristopher Brown. This matter is reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings. (KEB) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
13
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 9:34 AM
ORDER REVERSING AND REMANDING DEFENDANT'S DECISION TO DENY BENEFITS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief - Reply
Fri 02/15 10:18 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown. (Halpern, Elie) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Brief - Responsive
Fri 02/01 9:58 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re14 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Wed 01/02 9:28 AM
ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: re15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend13 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, by Judge David W. Christel. Responsive Brief due by 2/1/2019, Reply Brief due by 2/15/2019.(KEB) |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration
Mon 12/31 9:17 AM
DECLARATION of Joseph J. Langkamer filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend13 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Amend
Mon 12/31 9:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend13 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, , filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Noting Date 12/31/2018, (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 12/03 11:59 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown (Halpern, Elie) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Mon 11/05 7:57 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 11/5/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 12/3/2018, Responsive Brief due by 1/2/2019, Reply Brief due by 1/14/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (SCP) |
|
12 | 12
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 11/05 7:51 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Fri 10/05 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jeffrey E Staples for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Staples, Jeffrey) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/05 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph John Langkamer on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Saturday, September 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 09/22 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey E Staples on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Staples, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Tue 09/04 3:34 PM
DECLARATION Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown (Halpern, Elie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 09/04 3:26 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown on 9/4/2018 (Halpern, Elie) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/04 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kristopher Brown for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/15 12:33 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (SH) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Summons as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Kristopher Brown.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/15 12:29 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge David W. Christel.(SH) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/15 10:51 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (CMG) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/12 12:09 PM
CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KEB) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/14 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Kristopher Brown.(Halpern, Elie) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |