Prentiss County, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45723 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 1:18-cv-00097 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:04 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Prentiss County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:14 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1556868, filed by Prentiss County, Mississippi. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 6/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 6/14/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL (CTO-37) Case Transferred to District of Northern Ohio. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 6/14/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-00097. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |