District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Paul L Friedman
Case #: 1:18-cv-01422
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2018
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
DAVID BROCK
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON
Represented By
Katherine Marie Turner
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
David Evan Kendall
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Michael James Mestitz
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN PODESTA
Represented By
Gloria B Solomon
Trout Cacheris & Janis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
PETER STRZOK
Represented By
Aitan Dror Goelman
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GARY JOHN BYRNE
Represented By
Mark Ramsey Heilbrun
Harlan Bradley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GJB PROJECT
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AMERICAN BRIDGE 21ST CENTURY
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Katherine Marie Turner
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
David Evan Kendall
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Michael James Mestitz
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Defendant
CLINTON FOUNDATION
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Kevin Andrew Chambers
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
CLINTON GLOBAL INITIATIVE
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Defendant
CLINTON-GIUSTRA ENTERPRISE PARTNERSHIP
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Defendant
CORRECT THE RECORD
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
JAN GILOOLY
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Defendant
MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
GEORGE SOROS
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Benjamin P. McCallen
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Bower
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TRUE BLUE MEDIA, LLC
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
JONATHAN WACKROW
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Matthew E. Kelley
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Charles D. Tobin
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Terminated: 08/29/2018
Represented By
Ezra Woolf Reese
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Erik Elias
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sambo Dul
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 10/10 4:09 PM
USCA Case Number 19-7120 for79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GARY JOHN BYRNE. (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
80 80 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 10/08 4:17 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 10/8/19 re79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztd)
Related: [-]
79 79 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 10/08 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by GARY JOHN BYRNE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-6429154. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Heilbrun, Mark)
Related: [-]