REVERE v. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger Vinson |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01427 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant
ASCENSION HEALTH LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN (AMENDED AND RESTATED AS OF JANUARY 1, 2006)
|
|
Defendant
SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
|
|
Plaintiff
MAMIE REVERE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 07/24 10:05 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:18cv01178 filed 07/18/2018. (sdw) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 07/18 2:38 PM
Interdistrict Transfer to the Eastern District of Missouri located at 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis MO 63102. (sdw) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/18 2:27 PM
ORDER granting 4 Stipulation. The Clerk shall transfer this case as requested. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/18/2018. (sdw) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/17 2:48 PM
STIPULATION TO TRANSFER PLAINTIFFS LAWSUIT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI by MAMIE REVERE. (ORTIZ, NICK) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/17 4:20 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:4 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER PLAINTIFFS LAWSUIT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI. (sdw) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/18 8:04 AM
Summons Issued as to SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. (sdw) |
|
Att: 1 ASCENSION HEALTH LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN (AMENDED AND RESTATED AS OF JANUARY 1, 2006) | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/15 7:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ORTIZ, NICK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 7:23 PM
COMPLAINT against ASCENSION HEALTH LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN (AMENDED AND RESTATED AS OF JANUARY 1, 2006), SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4205817.), filed by MAMIE REVERE. (ORTIZ, NICK) |
|
Att: 1 SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, | ||
Att: 2 SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT ASCENSION HEALTH LONG-TERM DISABILITY PLAN (AMENDED AND RESTATED AS OF JANUARY 1, 2006) |