CENTENNIAL BANK v. ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Allen C Winsor |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00288 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 4:31 AM EST |
Defendant
ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHARLES H ROSENBERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CENTENNIAL BANK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/05 11:26 AM
ORDER CLOSING THE FILE. The parties have filed a joint stipulation of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. ECF No. 38 . The stipulation is effective without an order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). This order confirms that the case has been dismissed. The clerk will close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 03/05/2020. (rcb) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/05 8:16 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 4/3/2020 . (rcb) |
||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/04 5:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice by CENTENNIAL BANK. (BELL, KEITH) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 03/03 9:34 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: Set/Reset Deadlines (rcb) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 09/05 8:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/28/2020 . (toy) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/04 4:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 09/04 10:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re:35 Order. *Status report not filed* (toy) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
4
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/28 3:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:18cv288 AW/CAS. (pll) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 06/10 7:21 AM
ORDER REGARDING BANKRUPTCY STAY. Unless and until otherwise ordered, all proceedings in this case are STAYED under 11 U.S.C. §362. Defendants must file a notice in this Court within 30 days after the occurrence of any event or condition terminating the automatic stay either explicitly or by operation of law. Plaintiff must file a notice in this court within 30 days after the party or its attorney learns of the occurrence of any event or condition terminating the automatic stay either explicitly or by operation of law, provided, however, that if one such notice has been filed by any party, no party need file any additional notice. Defendants are requested to file, and Plaintiff must file, by the last day of each August and February (commencing with August 2019) a status report indicating whether the bankruptcy proceeding remains pending and the automatic stay remains in effect, provided, however, that if one such status report has been filed by any party for the period at issue, no party need file any additional status report. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant, Rose Printing Company, Inc., ECF No. 22 , is DENIED without prejudice to renew, after the stay has been lifted. (Status Report due by 8/30/2019 .), Set "STAYED" Flag. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/07/2019. (toy) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 05/10 8:02 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:34 Order to Show Cause. *Show Cause response not filed* (toy) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/29 10:54 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall show cause on or before May 8, 2019, why this case should not be stayed during the pending bankruptcy. Show Cause Response due by 5/8/2019 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/29/2019. (toy) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 04/26 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing Suggestion of Bankruptcy by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Fri 04/05 8:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING 31 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. The Clerk is directed to re-gavel Defendant's motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 22 . The parties need not file a joint status report on April 5, 2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/05/2019. (toy) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/04 2:14 PM
STATUS REPORT and Motion for Reconsideration (Order Doc. #30) by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/29 3:33 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The 22 motion is DENIED without prejudice. Since the parties have failed to comply with this Court's order of December 7, 2018, ECF No. 29 , the parties are directed to file a status report with this Court on or before Friday, April 5, 2019. ( Status Report due by 4/5/2019 .). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/29/2019. (toy) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 12/07 3:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO STAY DEADLINES 28 : This Court stays all deadlines pending the resolution of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Defense to file repression to motion for summary, if any, by 12/21/2018 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/7/18. (amm) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/07 3:04 PM
Set Deadlines as to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/21/2018) . (amm) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/03 3:57 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Request for Stay of Deadlines Pending Ruling Upon Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 11/27 8:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:16 Initial Scheduling Order. The Joint Status Report has not been filed (Joint Status Report due by 11/26/2018). (kjw) |
||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Pretrial Order
Wed 11/21 9:32 AM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/21/18. Attorney Conference to take place by 3/8/2019 . Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2019 . Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2019 1:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2019 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (amm) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/26 2:26 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:22 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendant, Rose Printing Company, Inc - Response due on 10/3/2018. (None filed to date.) (kdm) |
||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 10/23 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator (Joint) by CENTENNIAL BANK re20 Scheduling Order,, Case Referred to Mediation, (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/23 5:52 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint - Discovery Status Report by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/24 7:59 AM
Reset Deadline re:16 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 11/26/2018 . (vkm) |
||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 09/25 9:53 AM
Reset Deadline re:16 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 10/24/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/24 3:32 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report with Defendant, Rose Printing Company, Inc. by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Thu 09/13 8:35 AM
RULE 26 Disclosures by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC. (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 09/12 4:55 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendant, Rose Printing Company, Inc. by CENTENNIAL BANK. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 10/3/2018) . (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 09/12 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant, Rose Printing Company, Inc. by CENTENNIAL BANK (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Plaintiff (exhibits attached separately herein), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 1 (line of credit), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 2 (promissory note), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 3 (UCC-1), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 4 (guaranty), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 5 (promissory note), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 6 (promissory note), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 7 (promissory note), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 8 (promissory note), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 9 (guaranty), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 10 (assignment), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 11 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 12 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 13 (UCC-1), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 14 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 15 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 16 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 17 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 18 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 19 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 20 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 21 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 22 (change in terms agreement), | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 23 (security agreement), | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 24 (demand letter), | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 25 (forbearance agreement), | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 26 (forbearance agreement), | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 27 (UCC-1), | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit Aff. Ex. 28 (demand letter) | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 08/28 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER - re: 19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 11/21/2018 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/12/2018 . Mediation Report due by 1/2/2019 . Bench Trial set for 4/22/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/28/2018. (cle) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 08/24 8:23 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (vkm) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 08/23 4:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/23 4:55 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint Discovery by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 08/23 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Filing Suggestion of Bankruptcy of Charles H. Rosenberg, Jr. by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC, CHARLES H ROSENBERG (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/24 8:22 AM
Reset Deadline Re:16 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 9/24/2018 . (vkm) |
||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/25 8:15 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/7/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/6/2018 . Discovery due by 11/21/2018 . Status Report due by 8/23/2018 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/24/2018. (vkm) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/23 4:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defense by CHARLES H ROSENBERG. (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/23 4:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defense by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC. (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/17 12:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. ECF No. 10 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file their responsive pleading on or before 7/23/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/17/2018. (vkm) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 07/17 7:26 AM
ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/14/2018. (vkm) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 07/12 7:56 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY DAIMWOOD Re10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: Counsel should be advised by this entry that their CM/ECF address is different from the address listed on their pleadings. Please update in CM/ECF. (ckm) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/09 4:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Unopposed by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC, CHARLES H ROSENBERG. (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/09 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ROSE PRINTING COMPANY INC. (DUNLAP, DAVISSON) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 06/29 2:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CENTENNIAL BANK identifying Corporate Parent HOME BANCSHARES, INC. for CENTENNIAL BANK.. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/22 12:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Charles H. Rosenberg on June 18, 2018, filed by CENTENNIAL BANK. (BELL, KEITH) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/22 12:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rose Printing Company, Inc. on June 18, 2018, filed by CENTENNIAL BANK. (BELL, KEITH) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/18 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Rose Printing Company, Inc., Charles H. Rosenberg. (vkm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons (Rosenberg) | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/18 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH L BELL, JR on behalf of CENTENNIAL BANK (BELL, KEITH) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 06/18 10:48 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (vkm) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 06/18 10:48 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY KELSEY STONE: Re1 Complaint - Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". For future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website). Counsel is further advised that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website). The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (vkm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT against CENTENNIAL BANK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CFLNDC-4205795.), filed by CENTENNIAL BANK. (STONE, KELSEY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 29 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 30 Summons to Rose Printing Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 31 Summons to Charles H. Rosenberg |