SAMMONS v. FREEDOM FINANCIAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00142 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
FREEDOM FINANCIAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
VIVIAN SAMMONS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Mon 01/28 9:17 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 14 Order (jcw) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/28 8:54 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 13 Joint MOTION to Vacate. The default, ECF No. 6 , and default judgment, ECF No. 11 , are vacated. The clerk must enter an amended judgment stating, "Based on the parties stipulation, all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice." Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/28/2019. (jcw) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Vacate
Wed 12/19 3:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate11 Default Judgment, and for Dismissal with Prejudice by VIVIAN SAMMONS. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 11/28 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by VIVIAN SAMMONS (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Default
Mon 11/26 8:46 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 7 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS ADJUDGED that the plaintiff Vivian Sammons recover from the defendant Freedom Financial Asset Management, LLC doing business as Consolidation Plus the amount of $17,500 as damages, $4,905 as attorney's fees, and $440 as costs, for a total of Twenty-Two Thousand Eight Hundred Forty-Five Dollars ($22,845). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/21/2018. (jcw) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
13
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 09/19 12:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/18. **Please use the new initials RH/MJF on all future pleadings; i.e. 5:18cv142 RH/MJF. (pll) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit
Mon 09/10 3:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Freedom Financial Asset Management, LLC dba Consolidation Plus by VIVIAN SAMMONS. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Mon 09/10 3:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Freedom Financial Asset Management, LLC dba Consolidation Plus by VIVIAN SAMMONS. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 09/10 3:30 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Freedom Financial Asset Management, LLC dba Consolidation Plus by VIVIAN SAMMONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/24/2018) . (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 08/17 8:01 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint - 60 day deadline has expired without an appearance by the defendant. (jcw) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 08/13 12:43 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FREEDOM FINANCIAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC (jcw) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 08/10 1:48 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by VIVIAN SAMMONS. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/06 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIVIAN SAMMONS. FREEDOM FINANCIAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC served on 6/25/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/18 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to FREEDOM FINANCIAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC. (mlp) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/15 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT And Demand for Jury Trial against Freedom Financial Asset Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CFLNDC-4205752.), filed by Vivian Sammons. (SWIFT, AARON) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Request |