Owens v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Bryan |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05488 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 12/11 11:02 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. The Commissioner's final decision is AFFIRMED and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (SP) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
1 - Order
Fri 12/07 10:35 AM
ORDER AFFIRMING DENIAL OF BENEFITS. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief - Reply
Wed 11/21 10:45 AM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Elaina M Owens. (Grossman, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief - Responsive
Tue 11/13 9:50 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re9 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 10/15 9:34 AM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Elaina M Owens (Grossman, Amanda) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Mon 09/17 8:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Opening Brief due by 10/15/2018, Responsive Brief due by 11/13/2018, Reply Brief due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
7 | 7
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 09/17 7:28 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/25 8:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heather L Griffith on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Tue 07/17 11:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO on 7/17/2018, filed by Plaintiff Elaina M Owens. (Grossman, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/19 9:35 AM
(3) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 summons Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 summons Office of General Counsel | ||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against defendants Nancy A Berryhill, Social Security Administration (Summons(es) not issued), filed by Elaina M Owens. (JL) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/18 1:28 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/18 9:23 AM
Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (CMG) |
||
motion
Motion Calendar
Mon 06/18 1:31 PM
Check for service on or about 9/25/2018. (JL) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/15 1:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Elaina M Owens.(Grossman, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |