In re: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05489 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:41 AM PST |
Appellant
Travelers Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC)
1717 PACIFIC AVENUE ROOM 2100
TACOMA, WA 98402 |
|
Interested Party
Century Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Chubb Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
London Market Insurers
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Providence Washington Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Receiver
Resource Transition Consultants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 08/21 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. (MGC) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Mon 08/20 2:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying2 Motion for Leave to Appeal.(TG) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/03 11:15 AM
The Briefing Schedules and Noting Date for the Bankruptcy Appeal are premature and therefore terminated, as the Motion for Permission to Appeal2 is pending the court's ruling. (CMG) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
motion
Motion Calendar
Fri 06/29 10:38 AM
Bankruptcy Certificate of Record18 filed: Bankruptcy Appeal ready for consideration beginning 9/21/18.(CMG) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Bankruptcy Certificate of Record
Thu 06/28 3:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 8/7/2018, Appellee Response Brief due by 9/6/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/20/2018,(Bankruptcy Clerk (Tac), K. Lohr) |
|
Att: 1 Record on Appeal | ||
17 | 17
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/28 2:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA (Beatty, Jacquelyn) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/27 4:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Brandywine Holdings Corp. for Century Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Linde, Thomas) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/27 2:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Travelers Indemnity Company (Brownstein, Nancy) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/27 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appellee Fraser's Boiler Service Inc re13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Self, Katrina) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/27 1:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fraser's Boiler Service Inc (Self, Katrina) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/27 1:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Syhre, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
motion
Motion Calendar
Tue 06/26 12:23 PM
Certificate of Record/Bankrupty Status Report due by 7/20/2018. (CMG) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Mon 06/25 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re the Applications for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (3 ,4 ,5 ): Applications unnecessary as counsel have been admitted PHV in bankruptcy court. Financial Deputy advised to refund fee. (CMG) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Bankruptcy Record Status Request
Wed 06/20 12:07 PM
Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal (CMG) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Bankruptcy Appeal Letter
Wed 06/20 12:05 PM
LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal (CMG) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 11:23 AM
ORDER on the5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joshua Taylor for Travelers Indemnity Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CMG) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 11:15 AM
ORDER on the4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Filiberto Agusti for Travelers Indemnity Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CMG) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 11:10 AM
ORDER on the3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Frank Winston, Jr for Travelers Indemnity Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CMG) |
|
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Wed 06/20 12:10 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/27/2018. (CMG) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/19 3:49 PM
REPLY, filed by Appellant Travelers Indemnity Company, TO RESPONSE to2 MOTION for Leave (Brownstein, Nancy) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/19 3:47 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joshua Taylor FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Appellant Travelers Indemnity Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5363407 (Brownstein, Nancy) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/19 3:45 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Filiberto Agusti FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Appellant Travelers Indemnity Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5363391 (Brownstein, Nancy) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/19 3:42 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Frank Winston, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Appellant Travelers Indemnity Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5363374 (Brownstein, Nancy) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Leave
Fri 06/15 4:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal, filed by Appellant Travelers Indemnity Company. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 6/22/2018. (Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
misc
Transmittal of Documents
Fri 06/15 4:53 PM
TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - Record on Appeal - BK Internal Appeal No: 18-T004; Bk No: 18-41245 (Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/26 4:20 PM
Attorney Aron Oliner added as Pro Hac Vice counsel for London Market Insurers. (CMG) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/26 4:28 PM
|
||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/26 4:40 PM
Attorney Mark D Plevin added as Pro Hac Vice counsel for Century Indemnity Company. (CMG) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 07/03 11:22 AM
RESPONSE/OPPOSITION by Appellee Fraser's Boiler Service Inc and Receiver Resource Transition Consultants LLC, to Travelers Indemnity Company's2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (CMG) |