Whitley et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45598 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Western, 2:18-cv-02290 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:04 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tennessee Board of Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
State of Tennessee
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teri Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Denson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Denson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roxie Whitley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:58 PM EDT |
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. from Circuit Court of Fayette County, TN, case number 24CCI-2018-CV-14 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2780039), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc..(Tom, Robert) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-MDL Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-Fayette County Circuit Court Rule Docket Report | ||
2 | 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Complex track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint proposed order submitted by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tom, Robert) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Smith on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. AND ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT7 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/7/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger W. Dickson on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation (Dickson, Roger) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
11 | 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by McKesson Corporation.(Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Consultation | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Thomas on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC. (Thomas, James) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor B. Mayes on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica INC. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mayes, Taylor) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
14 | 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceutica INC. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mayes, Taylor) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
15 | 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Janssen Pharmaceutica INC. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mayes, Taylor) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
16 | 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Purdue by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.. (Thomas, James) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lela M. Hollabaugh on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Hollabaugh, Lela) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
18 | 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACTAVIS LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Barger, Keane) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
19 | 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.. (Thomas, James) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Keane Addison Barger on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Barger, Keane) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Hollabaugh, Lela) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Tom, Robert) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
23 | 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Dickson, Roger) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
24 | 24 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document22 Notice (Other) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note: appropriate event is found under "Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Corporate Disclosure Statement". By using the correct events, it aids the court if running report for specific events. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
25 | 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
26 | 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT11 15 16 18 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/8/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
27 | 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John-David H. Thomas on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Thomas, John-David) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
28 | 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Anthony Oliver on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Oliver, Jeremy) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Harrison on behalf of Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
30 | 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
31 | 31 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Standing by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
32 | 32 MOTION to Dismiss Products Liability by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
33 | 33 MOTION to Dismiss Statute of Limitations by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
34 | 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
35 | 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Stephen Range, Jr on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Range, Ronald) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
36 | 36 MOTION to Join Parents as Parties proposed order submitted by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
37 | 37 NOTICE by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (unfiled) (Harrison, Jennifer) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-30) Finalized on 5/17/18. Please see pleading (3 in CAC/2:18-cv-03662, 3 in CAC/2:18-cv-03712, 3 in ILC/4:18-cv-04088, 3 in ILS/3:18-cv-01069, 3 in INS/3:18-cv-00086, 1505 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OHS/2:18-cv-00433, 3 in TNW/2:18-cv-02290).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 5/17/2018.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/2:18-cv-03662, CAC/2:18-cv-03712, ILC/4:18-cv-04088, ILS/3:18-cv-01069, INS/3:18-cv-00086, OHS/2:18-cv-00433, TNW/2:18-cv-02290 (CMD). (agj) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | ||
38 | 38 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) MDL No. 2804. Signed by Jeffery N. Lüthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/17/2018. (agj) [Transferred from tnwd on 5/18/2018.] | |
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
39 | 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Western. Case number 2:18-cv-02290. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |