New Jersey District Court
Judge:Noel L Hillman
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:18-cv-10704
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2018
Terminated:Jan 06, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 4:47 AM EST
Defendant
AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL P. DALY
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
DANIEL ELLIOT BREWER
Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH RABINOWITZ
Represented By
RAYMOND NICHOLAS BARTO
Squirieri & Fearon LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2019
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/25/2019. (rss, )

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 22, 2021
44 44 misc Letter Fri 01/22 1:48 PM
Letter from Savcho Gyorev. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
43 43 misc Stipulation Mon 01/06 3:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 01/06 3:15 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
42 42 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 12/18 12:17 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DANIEL ELLIOT BREWER terminated. (BREWER, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
41 41 misc Transcript Thu 10/03 10:07 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/6/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2019. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
40 40 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/10 8:45 AM
ORDER Directing Defendant to identify all lawsuits (name, Court, docket number) where allegations similar to those made by plaintiff in this case were made, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/9/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
39 39 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 3:51 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Status Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 1/31/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/9/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
38 38 minutes Status Conference Fri 09/06 2:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: In-Person Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
37 37 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Fri 08/30 2:28 PM
Stipulated Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/30/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
36 36 misc Letter Tue 08/27 1:55 PM
Letter from Michael P. Daly CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. (DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
35 35 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/10 8:49 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/9/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
34 34 minutes Status Conference Tue 07/09 10:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: In-Person Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 07/05 6:04 PM
STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC.(BREWER, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
32 32 order Order Wed 07/03 9:25 AM
TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received plaintiff's July 2, 2019 letter application; and the Court noting the conference scheduled on July 8, 2019 was set in an Order entered on May 16, 2019 [Doc. No. 28]; and the Court further noting the parties have had more than a reasonable time to meet and confer; and the Court intending to expeditiously manage this litigation; and the Court finding that good cause does not exist to postpone the July 8 conference; and accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED all present scheduling deadlines shall remain in place and counsels' application to reschedule the July 8 conference is DENIED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/3/19. (Schneider, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
31 31 misc Letter Tue 07/02 5:30 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Attorney. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
30 30 misc Letter Fri 05/17 2:22 PM
Letter from Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
29 29 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 2:37 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/16/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
28 28 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/16 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/16/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 05/16 10:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 5/15/2019. (se, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 6:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC.(DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Letter Wed 05/08 2:59 PM
Letter from Olimpio Lee Squitieri Re Joint Proposed Discovery Plan.(SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan
Friday, April 26, 2019
25 25 order Order Fri 04/26 3:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference originally set for 5/1/2019 has been RESCHEDULED to 5/15/2019 at 12:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/26/2019. (se, )
Related: [-]
24 24 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/26 2:24 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The time of the initial conference scheduled on May 1, 2019 is hereby changed to 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/26/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/02 2:26 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant's22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 5/8/2019; The May 1, 2019 In-Person conference is continued until 5/15/2019 at 9:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/2/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/01 3:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND TO CONTINUE THE MAY 1, 2019 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC.(DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 04/01 10:18 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/1/2019 03:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/1/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/01 4:23 PM
Set Deadlines as to22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND TO CONTINUE THE MAY 1, 2019 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE . Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/25 4:00 PM
ORDER Denying Defendant's10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/25/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
19 19 22 pgs order Opinion Mon 03/25 3:58 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/25/2019. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
18 18 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Mon 01/28 2:52 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RAYMOND NICHOLAS BARTO terminated. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/28 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by OLIMPIO LEE SQUITIERI on behalf of JOSEPH RABINOWITZ (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
16 16 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 09/24 11:07 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC re10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike (DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/17 5:20 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ re10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike (BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
14 14 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 08/28 11:27 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ re10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike (BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/28 1:54 PM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/17 7:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC. (BREWER, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/17 7:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ELLIOT BREWER on behalf of AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC (BREWER, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/17 9:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike . Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
11 11 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 08/16 8:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC re10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike (DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 08/16 8:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Strike by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2018(DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/07 11:10 AM
ORDER granting4 ,5 Motion for Stephen J. Fearon Jr., and Paul V. Sweeny Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/7/2018. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
8 8 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 07/23 12:27 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint. Attorney MICHAEL P. DALY for AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC added. (DALY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 07/23 1:30 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/16/2018. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
7 7 respm Certification in Support of Motion Wed 07/18 10:34 AM
CERTIFICATION in Support filed by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ re5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul V. Sweeny (BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Certification in Support of Motion Wed 07/18 10:33 AM
CERTIFICATION in Support filed by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ re4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. (BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Wed 07/18 9:28 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The motions to appear pro hac vice4 and5 submitted by RAYMOND NICHOLAS BARTO on 7/17/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATION PAGE ONLY WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the event CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION found under RESPONSES AND REPLIES. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/18 9:30 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul V. Sweeny ,4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/17 5:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul V. Sweeny by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ.(BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/17 4:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen J. Fearon, Jr. by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ.(BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/17 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH RABINOWITZ. AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. (BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/19 11:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN WATER RESOURCES, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Sanders* (rss, )
Related: [-]
order Order re Diversity of Citizenship (Hillman) Tue 06/19 11:13 AM
Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties,[LINK:click here] , no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/19/2018. (rss, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 06/19 11:15 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/18 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against American Water Resources, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8819235) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Joseph Rabinowitz.(BARTO, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/19 10:02 AM
Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, )
Related: [-]