PALASTRO v. YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joy Flowers Conti |
Referred: | Patricia L Dodge |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00786 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 4:03 AM EST |
Defendant
KASIM BIYIKILI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MURAT DEMIRKAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ADAM OKSUZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
DAVID B. WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER PALASTRO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
![]() ORDER re35 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by JENNIFER PALASTRO. Based on the Stipulation of Dismissal the case is dismissed with prejudice, each party will bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/20/2019. (smc) |
|
35 | 35
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by JENNIFER PALASTRO. (Sansone, Joel) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The court has been advised that the above-captioned action has been settled and that the only matter remaining to be completed is submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). It appears that there is no further action required by the court at this time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above-captioned case closed; that nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate the same in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including but not limited to enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/19/2019. (smc) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 07/18 9:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Settlement Conference held on 7/17/2019. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Case Management Order
Wed 07/03 9:32 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/17/2019 09:30 AM in Suite 9210 before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Trial counsel must attend and shall be accompanied by their respective clients or a client representative who has full settlement authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/3/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
minutes
Post-Discovery Status Conference
Fri 06/28 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Post-Discovery Status Conference held on 6/28/2019. Settlement Conference to be scheduled. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/19 10:27 AM
ORDER In Person Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in Suite 9210 before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 06/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/19 9:57 AM
Order granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment28 . All existing deadlines are terminated. New deadlines will be set at the post discovery status conference to be held on 6/28/19 at 1:30 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 6/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
minutes
Telephonic Status Conference
Tue 06/18 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/18/2019 with respect to the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment28 . An appropriate order follows. (Court Reporter: None) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm) |
||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 06/17 3:37 PM
ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Suite 9210 before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 06/17/2019. Parties will be notified through email for instructions. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Proposed Order re28 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. Motion(s) referred to Patricia L. Dodge. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/07 12:12 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:19-mc-711. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/6/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, ) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Status Conference held on 5/2/2019. Motions due by 6/30/2019. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019. Reply to Response due by 8/10/2019. Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 7/31/2019. Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 8/31/2019. (Court Reporter: none) (spc) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of JENNIFER PALASTRO. (Tuttle, Elizabeth) |
|
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of JENNIFER PALASTRO. (Terzigni, Massimo) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/29 9:21 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion extension of time to complete discovery. Discovery to be completed by May 31, 2019. Further delay by plaintiff may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 04/29/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Proposed Order re21 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 03/04 8:53 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Status Conference previously set for 4/9/2019 10:00 AM is reset for 5/2/2019 09:30 AM in Suite 9240 before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 3/4/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc) |
|
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JENNIFER PALASTRO. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Sansone, Joel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting17 Motion to enter stipulated protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 1/14/2019. (spc) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Protective Order by YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Status Conference held on 1/7/2019.15 Unopposed Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline filed by YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL granted: Discovery due by 3/31/2019. Status Conference set for 4/9/2019 10:00 AM in Suite 9240 before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (Court Reporter: none) (spc) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 10/15/2018. (White, David) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. David White is appointed as mediator. Party DAVID B. WHITE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/4/2018. (spc) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Mediation by DAVID B. WHITE. Mediation Date October 15, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (White, David) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell: Case Management Conference held on 9/27/2018. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Defendants' Expert Reports due by 2/18/2019. Expert Depositions to be completed by 2/28/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 1/28/2019. Status Conference set for 1/7/2019 09:30 AM in Suite 9240 before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. (Court Reporter: none) (spc) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 09/20 4:21 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer presiding in case. (nll) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 09/20 4:27 PM
Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti presiding and Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell referred. (nll) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JENNIFER PALASTRO. (Sansone, Joel) |
|
9 | 9
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 09:30 AM in Suite 9240 before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 9/18/2018. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 9/13/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 8/28/2018. (spc) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNIFER PALASTRO. KASIM BIYIKILI waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; MURAT DEMIRKAN waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; ADAM OKSUZ waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Sansone, Joel) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Laughlin on behalf of KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Laughlin, Erica) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E. Novak on behalf of KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL. (Novak, Jean) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against KASIM BIYIKILI, MURAT DEMIRKAN, ADAM OKSUZ, YOUNG SCHOLARS OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHARTER SCHOOL (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 4765864), filed by JENNIFER PALASTRO. (plh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |