Still v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Richard Creatura |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00887 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Fri 03/22 2:54 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Commissioner of Social Security and against Shannon Jean Still, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
22 | 22
order
1 - Order
Fri 03/22 2:50 PM
ORDER re4 Plaintiff's Complaint, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Brief - Reply
Mon 01/14 11:44 AM
REPLY BRIEF re20 Brief - Responsive by Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Brief - Responsive
Mon 12/31 10:49 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re15 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Tue 11/27 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sarah E. Moum for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Moum, Sarah) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/27 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lars Joseph Nelson on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/21 5:02 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Responsive Brief now due by 12/31/2018; Reply Brief due by 1/14/2019. (KAM) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Amend
Tue 11/20 3:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend11 JRC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Noting Date 11/20/2018, (Moum, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Brief - Opening
Thu 11/01 1:48 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/19 4:14 PM
ORDER AMENDING THE SCHEDULING ORDER RE:12 Motion for Extension of Time - Opening Brief due by 11/1/2018, Responsive Brief due by 11/29/2018, Reply Brief due by 12/13/2018, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration
Wed 10/17 9:44 AM
DECLARATION of Edward A. Wicklund filed by Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still re12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Wed 10/17 9:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still. Noting Date 10/17/2018, (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
JRC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Mon 09/24 3:15 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 9/21/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 10/22/2018, Responsive Brief due by 11/19/2018, Reply Brief due by 12/3/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (apb) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Fri 09/21 7:09 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill.(Moum, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/09 7:26 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nancy A Berryhill on 7/25/2018 (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/03 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E. Moum on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Moum, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/21 11:15 AM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward A Wicklund for Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 11:20 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward A. Wicklund FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Shannon Jean Still (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5364263 (Bam, Maren) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/20 10:32 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summons to Attorney General, D.C. attached as main document).(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Office of Regional Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to US Attorney Seattle | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/20 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summonses as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Shannon Jean Still.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/20 10:26 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/20 9:45 AM
CONSENT filed by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 3:16 PM
Judge J. Richard Creatura added. (DJ) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/18 8:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Shannon Jean Still.(Bam, Maren) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons |