Huetson v. Standard Insurance Company
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00888 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 2:18 AM PST |
Defendant
Standard Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin E. Huetson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 12/04 11:21 AM
ORDER dismissing action and all claims with prejudice re: parties'11 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/29 11:21 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Erin E. Huetson. (Cunnane, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
Thu 11/01 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Sarah E Swale. Filed by Defendant Standard Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah) Modified address on 11/1/2018 (DS) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM)
Thu 08/02 1:42 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Bench Trial is set for 5/13/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/14/2018, Motions due by 12/14/2018, Discovery completed by 1/14/2019, Dispositive motions due by 2/12/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/29/2019, Motions in Limine due by 4/15/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/8/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 5/8/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 07/31 10:28 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Plaintiff Erin E. Huetson.(Cunnane, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Thu 06/21 3:21 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Standard Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah) |
|
6 | 6
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Thu 06/21 1:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/26/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Tue 06/19 3:38 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 3:36 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/18 10:41 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group Inc, Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for Standard Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Standard Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice-Other
Mon 06/18 10:34 AM
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Standard Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Mon 06/18 10:33 AM
DECLARATION OF SARAH E. SWALE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Standard Insurance Company(Swale, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/18 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 17 2-12084 31; Attorney Sarah E Swale added to party Standard Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Standard Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint First Amended |