Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Gregory L Taddonio
Case #: 2:18-bk-22478
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Jun 07, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jul 05, 2019
Converted:Apr 26, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HG Ventures, Inc. d/b/a Diamond Head Trucking
100 Phoenix Dr
Finleyville, PA 15332-9601
Represented By
Donald R. Calaiaro
Calaiaro Valencik
contact info
Michael Kaminski
Calaiaro Valencik
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Pamela J. Wilson
810 Vermont Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15234
Represented By
Pamela J. Wilson
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Liberty Center. 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Larry E. Wahlquist
U.S. Trustee Program/dept. Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 9:28 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Tue 06/19 4:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by HG Ventures, Inc. d/b/a Diamond Head Trucking Government Proof of Claim due by 12/17/2018. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 07/3/2018. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/17/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 10/17/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 07/3/2018. Declaration of Schedules due 07/3/2018. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 07/3/2018. Schedule A/B due 07/3/2018. Schedule D due 07/3/2018. Schedule E/F due 07/3/2018. Schedule G due 07/3/2018. Schedule H due 07/3/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/3/2018. Summary of schedules due 07/3/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 07/3/2018. (Calaiaro, Donald)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Tue 06/19 4:13 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor HG Ventures, Inc. d/b/a Diamond Head Trucking (Calaiaro, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 06/19 4:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 18-22478 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 13804071, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]