David Hildes v. Arthur Andersen LLP, et al
Original Case: 3:08-cv-00008
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:11-cv-56592 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2011 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 1:21 AM PST |
Defendant - Appellee
ARTHUR ANDERSEN LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS G. WATROUS, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DOUGLAS S. POWANDA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DOE, as the Executor of the Estate of David A. Farley
|
|
Intervenor - Appellee
JOHN J. MOORES
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER A. COLE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
RICHARD A. HOSLEY
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
CHARLES A. NOELL, III
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
NORRIS VAN DEN BERG, Outside Directors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID HILDES, Individually and as Trustee of The David and Kathleen Hildes 1999 Charitable Remainder Unitrust dated June 25, 1999
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 19 2013
FILED OPINION (STEPHEN S. TROTT, CARLOS F. LUCERO and WILLIAM A. FLETCHER) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: CFL Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8746965] |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2016 12:44 AM PST |