Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:11-cv-35830
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2011
Terminated:Oct 23, 2012

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10/29/2015 11:39 AM PDT
Wednesday, October 05, 2011
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APLT IN PRO PER AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APLES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Christian Behrend Doscher on 10/04/2011. Appellant Christian Behrend Doscher opening brief due 01/12/2012. [7917951] (KM) [Entered: 10/05/2011 03:16 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Received motion to to proceed In Forma Pauperis served on 10/05/2011. [7917981] (KM) [Entered: 10/05/2011 03:23 PM]
Related: [-]