California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:18-cv-03642
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 12:59 AM PST
Defendant
Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC
Defendant
SCL USA Inc.
Defendant
SCL Group, Limited
Defendant
SCL Elections Ltd.
Defendant
Aleksandr Kogan
Defendant
Global Science Research Ltd.
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
Represented By
Joshua S. Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kristin A. Linsley
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Brian M. Lutz
contact info
David Evan Ross
Kelogg,huber,hansen,todd,evans & Figel PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Cambridge Analytica Political LLC
Defendant
Cambridge Analytica LLC
Defendant
Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC
Plaintiff
Gerry Galipault
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Hunstone
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Ramirez
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lindsay Rathert
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ben Redmond
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Westendorf
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Woods
Represented By
David Gerard Holmes
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2020
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria in case 3:18-cv-01732-VC; granting (590) Stipulation re voluntary dismissal of plaintiffs Amezcua, Forman, Herman, Holsinger, Lloyd, Robertson, Smith, Schinder, Short, Tutt, Watson, Wenz. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 21, 2020
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/21 10:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria in case 3:18-cv-01732-VC; granting (590) Stipulation re voluntary dismissal of plaintiffs Amezcua, Forman, Herman, Holsinger, Lloyd, Robertson, Smith, Schinder, Short, Tutt, Watson, Wenz. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
25 25 misc Transcript Tue 06/23 10:08 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 19, 2020, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (464 in 3:18-md-02843-VC) Transcript Order, (465 in 3:18-md-02843-VC) Transcript Order
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
24 24 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 06/20 9:39 AM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-00531. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 6/20/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
23 23 TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the action(s) on the attached schedule to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 6, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (fms)
Related: [-]
Case transferred electronically to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (fms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
22 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Global Science Research Ltd. on 5/8/18. (Global Science Research Ltd. answer due 5/29/2018). (rwc)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Global Science Research Ltd. answer due 5/29/2018. (rwc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
21 21 PRAECIPE filed by David Gerard Holmes on behalf of Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods requesting Clerk to issue //Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge Regarding Service of Complaint on Global Science Research Ltd.(Holmes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 31, 2018
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Orin Snyder,Brian M. Lutz,Joshua S. Lipshutz,Kristin A. Linsley for Facebook, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (fms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
20 20 STATEMENT re19 MOTION for Protective Order //Motion of Plaintiffs for Preservation Order - Statement Pursuant to D. Del. LR 7.1.1 by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods.(Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
19 19 MOTION for Protective Order //Motion of Plaintiffs for Preservation Order - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods.Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 18, 2018
18 18 NOTICE of Suggestion By Defendant Facebook, Inc. of Bankruptcy of Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC and SCL USA Inc. by Facebook, Inc. (Ross, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
17 17 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge from Christopher P. Simon, Esq. regarding Notifying the Court of a related action. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
16 16 SO ORDERED: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Facebook, Inc., subject to concurrence and order by the Court, that: 1. The requirement for Facebook to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be stayed in this action pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the pending Motion to Transfer and for Consolidation (MDL No. 2843, Dkt. No. 1), subject to paragraph 2; 2. Should the Motion to Transfer and for Consolidation be denied, Facebook will have thirty (30) days from the date of such denial to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; and 3. Plaintiffs and Facebook reserve all other rights.(cak)
Related: [-]
15 15 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to Global Science Research Ltd. (crb)
Related: [-]
14 14 Joint STIPULATION re1 Complaint,, "Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding a Response of Facebook, Inc. to Complaint Pending JPML Ruling" by Facebook, Inc.. (Ross, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Orin Snyder, Joshua S. Lipshutz, Brian M. Lutz and Kristin A. Linsley - filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/30/18. (cak)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
13 13 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher P. Simon, Esq. re Summons Issued,12 Praecipe, Regarding Service of Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 PRAECIPE filed by Christopher Page Simon on behalf of Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods requesting Clerk to issue Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Global Science Research Ltd. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Global Science Research Ltd. on 4/10/2018. (jcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
10 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Orin Snyder, Joshua S. Lipshutz, Brian M. Lutz and Kristin A. Linsley - filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Ross, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Ross, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Amendment to7 Waiver of Service Executed,, . (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC on 4/26/2018. (jcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault: For Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica Political LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL Elections Ltd. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL Group Limited waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault: For Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Simon, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
SO ORDERED granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Esquire of Fields PLLC - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Jury, Esquire of McCue & Partners, LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert F. Ruyak, Esquire, Korula T. Cherian, Esquire, Richard Ripley, Esquire and Rebecca Anzidei, Esquire of Ruyak Cherian LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynges jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. § 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. (cak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Motion referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
5 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Ruyak, Esquire, Korula T. Cherian, Esquire, Richard Ripley, Esquire and Rebecca Anzidei, Esquire of Ruyak Cherian LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Jury, Esquire of McCue & Partners, LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Esquire of Fields PLLC - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmfn)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC, Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC, Cambridge Analytica LLC, Cambridge Analytica Political LLC, Facebook, Inc., Global Science Research Ltd., Aleksandr Kogan, SCL Elections Ltd., SCL Group Limited, SCL USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2358041.) - filed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault.(nmfn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued. (nmfn)
Related: [-]