|
GPO
Aug 20 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Extension of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc, for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by James Mattis, United States Department of Defense. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
|
|
GPO
Oct 11 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Telephonic Case Management Conference Hearing filed by Jiahao Kuang, Deron Cooke. Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
|
|
GPO
Oct 17 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Production Deadline, Briefing Schedule, and [Proposed] Hearing Date filed by Jiahao Kuang, Deron Cooke. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2018. Deadline for Defendants to produce the administrative record: 10/19/2018. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief due 10/26/2018. Defendants' response due 11/2/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
|
|
GPO
Nov 16 2018
ORDER GRANTING CLASS CERTIFICATION, DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS, AND GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 42 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 31 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
|
|
GPO
Jan 23 2019
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY JOINT LETTER BRIEF re 87 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 23, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
|
|
GPO
Feb 11 2019
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Case Management Schedule filed by Jiahao Kuang, Deron Cooke Substantial completion of document production 5/1/2019. Submission of final interrogatories and requests for admissions 6/3/2019. Fact discovery cut-off 7/3/2019. Expert disclosures 7/19/2019. Expert rebuttal 8/19/2019. Expert discovery cut-off 9/6/2019. Deadline to file notice or seek leave to supplement the administrative recordss-motion due 11/15/2019. Defendants' reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 11, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019) 9/8/2019. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment due 10/4/2019. Defendants' opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due 10/25/2019. Plaintiffs' reply in support of summary judgment and opposition to Defendants' cro
|
|
GPO
Feb 20 2019
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AND GRANTING MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
|
|
GPO
Apr 15 2019
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 104 Motion to Stay. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
|