Fairfield v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-10945 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 19, 2018 3:54 AM EST |
Defendant
MERCK & CO INC
|
|
Defendant
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp
|
|
In Re
FOSAMAX (ALENDRONATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II)
|
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Fairfield
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
mdl
MDL Closed
Wed 02/01 1:08 PM
Member Case Closed on 12/13/2022 for MDL 2243. (jjc, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/13 3:39 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, ) |
||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/21 2:15 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT and Rule 54(b) Certification. Entering final judgment on all claims against all Plaintiff's identified on Exhibit A; Dismissing all cases listed on Exhibit A with prejudice; further Ordering Civil Action No 12-161 will proceed separately from the rest of the member cases; Plaintiffs in 1161 shall file a motion to remand within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/18/2022. (eaj) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
13
pgs
order
Order Reopening Case
Wed 02/19 10:19 AM
ORDER Re-Opening Cases Administratively Terminated herein; all discovery in all pending actions in the Fosamax MDL remain stayed until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/18/2020. (abr) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 07/10 3:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter is administratively terminated pending the Supreme Court's decision on Defendants' Petition for Certiorari. Should the Petition be denied, the Court will reopen this case for further proceedings.. Ordered by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/10/2018. (jmm, ) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Mon 06/25 2:47 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (kas, ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/25 10:49 AM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (ces) |
||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Fri 06/22 2:19 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00366. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
utility
ICMS - converted docket entry
Fri 06/22 12:51 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-148 from District of New Jersey re:MDL 2243 (KJA) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Case Reassignment (Random Selection): Case Reassigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JM) | |
4 | 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Judge Claria Horn Boom: Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter, and the action is hereby REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials RGJ on all further pleadings. cc: counsel, RGJ (CM) (JM) | |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summonses Issued as to Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attested copy of complaint e-mailed to counsel for Plaintiff this date.) (CDF) | |
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. Magistrate Judge designation: Dave Whalin. (CDF) | |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ruth Fairfield. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2656517.) (CDF) | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |