California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Kendall J Newman
Case #: 2:18-cv-01830
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2018
Terminated:Jul 28, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 23, 2018 1:57 AM PST
Defendant
County of Sacramento
Represented By
Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Longyear O'Dea & Lavra, LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Cahill
Longyear, O'Dea & Lavra, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
N. M.
Represented By
Melissa Catherine Nold
Law Office Of John Burris
contact info
John L. Burris
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info
Plaintiff
Brigett McIntyre
Represented By
Melissa Catherine Nold
Law Office Of John Burris
contact info
John L. Burris
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
City of Rancho Cordova
Terminated: 11/05/2018
Represented By
William E. Camy
Porter Scott
contact info
Carl L. Fessenden
Porter Scott, PC
contact info

GPO Nov 05 2018
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/2/18 DISMISSING the City of Rancho Cordova. (Becknal, R)
GPO Dec 07 2018
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/7/18 VACATING the 12/17/18 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. The parties shall serve the initial disclosures by 1/11/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by no later than 11/1/2019 and rebuttal expert disclosures due on or before 12/6/2019. All discovery shall be completed by 1/6/2020. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 3/2/2020. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM and the Jury Trial is SET for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Mar 26 2019
STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/26/2019. (Washington, S)
GPO Oct 11 2019
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/11/19 ORDERING that expert disclosures are now due on 1/6/2020, rebuttal expert disclosures are now due on 2/3/2020, close of expert discovery are now due on 2/17/2020 and the close of fact discovery remains on 1/6/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jun 10 2020
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/2020 GRANTING Plaintiff leave to file petition and order to compromise Minor Plaintiff N.M.'s Claim under seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Jul 28 2020
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/28/20 ORDERING that this entire action is dismissed with prejudice with each side to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
GPO Jun 08 2021
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/8/2021 ORDERING Wells Fargo Bank issue to a cashier's check in the amount of $619.99 made payable to Cassius Hudson for the benefit of Minor Plaintiff N.M. from Wells Fargo Bank blocked account No.: XXX-XXX-6157 so that she may purchase a Speech Tablet for Minor Plaintiff N.M.(Becknal, R)
GPO Sep 28 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/2022 DIRECTING that Wells Fargo Bank issue a cashier's check in the amount of $4,000.00, made payable to Cassius Hudson for the benefit of Minor Plaintiff N.M. (Perdue, C.)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
39 39 3 pgs order Order Wed 09/28 11:31 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/2022 DIRECTING that Wells Fargo Bank issue a cashier's check in the amount of $4,000.00, made payable to Cassius Hudson for the benefit of Minor Plaintiff N.M. (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
37 37 misc Petition Mon 09/26 9:12 AM
PETITION for WITHDRAWAL of FUNDS from Blocked Account by N. M.(Nold, Melissa) Modified on 9/26/2022 (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
order Minute Order Mon 09/26 12:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court HEREBY ORDERS37 Petitioner Cassius Hudson-Bernstine's Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
36 36 3 pgs order Order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Tue 06/08 2:40 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/8/2021 ORDERING Wells Fargo Bank issue to a cashier's check in the amount of $619.99 made payable to Cassius Hudson for the benefit of Minor Plaintiff N.M. from Wells Fargo Bank blocked account No.: XXX-XXX-6157 so that she may purchase a Speech Tablet for Minor Plaintiff N.M.(Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
35 35 order Minute Order Fri 06/04 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court HEREBY ORDERS33 Plaintiff's Motion for Disbursement of Funds REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
34 34 respm Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 05/28 10:59 AM
STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by County of Sacramento to33 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (Cahill, Nicole)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Disbursement of Funds Fri 05/28 12:02 AM
MOTION for DISBURSEMENT of FUNDS by N. M.. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
32 32 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/28 10:52 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/28/20 ORDERING that this entire action is dismissed with prejudice with each side to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
31 31 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/27 3:22 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Entire Action re1 Complaint by N. M., Brigett McIntyre. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
30 30 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/12 8:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the20 Notice of Settlement filed 12/20/2019 and the28 Court's Order filed 6/10/2020 granting leave to file the petition and order to compromise Minor Plaintiff N.M.'s Claims under seal, the Court hereby sets a Status Conference re Further Proceedings and Settlement on 8/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 7/20/2020. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
29 29 misc Sealed Event Wed 06/10 10:35 AM
SEALED EVENT. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/10 10:34 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/2020 GRANTING Plaintiff leave to file petition and order to compromise Minor Plaintiff N.M.'s Claim under seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
27 27 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/05 12:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that23 Plaintiffs' Motion to appoint a Guardian Ad Litem and for Compromise of Minor's Claim now set for hearing on 6/15/2020 is taken off calendar and under submission, to be decided on the papers. No appearance is required. The Court shall issue a separate order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
26 26 respm Statement of Non-Opposition Thu 04/30 12:55 PM
STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by County of Sacramento to23 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem.(Longyear, Dayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Non Opp to Leave to File Under Seal (ECF 22)
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
25 25 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Wed 04/29 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Due to the filing of23 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem and for Compromise of Minor's Claim now set for 6/15/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, the pretrial conference date of 5/11/2020 and trial date of 7/7/2020 are vacated. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Wed 04/29 11:41 AM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on23 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem : Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appoint Guardian ad Litem Wed 04/29 11:00 AM
MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM and to Compromise Minor's Claim by N. M.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) Wed 04/29 2:36 AM
NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by N. M..(Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request to Seal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Adante D. Pointer,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2019
21 21 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/20 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to a20 Notice of Settlement filed on 12/20/2019, this case has settled. Accordingly, the parties shall file the properly-noticed motion for minor's compromise pursuant to Local Rules 202(b) and 230, and no later than 3/2/2020, or a Joint Status Report if the motion has not been filed by that date. All other pending dates and deadlines will be vacated upon the filing of the motion for minor's compromise. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 12/20 10:33 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by County of Sacramento. Dispositional Docs due by 3/2/2020. (Cahill, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
19 19 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/11 10:04 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/11/19 ORDERING that expert disclosures are now due on 1/6/2020, rebuttal expert disclosures are now due on 2/3/2020, close of expert discovery are now due on 2/17/2020 and the close of fact discovery remains on 1/6/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
18 18 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/09 3:40 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines by County of Sacramento. (Cahill, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/16 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by County of Sacramento. (Longyear, Dayton)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 2:47 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Adante Pointer on behalf of N. M., Brigett McIntyre. Attorney Pointer, Adante added. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/26 10:33 AM
STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/26/2019. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
14 14 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/22 2:41 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by County of Sacramento. (Cahill, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
13 13 5 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/07 1:42 PM
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/7/18 VACATING the 12/17/18 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. The parties shall serve the initial disclosures by 1/11/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by no later than 11/1/2019 and rebuttal expert disclosures due on or before 12/6/2019. All discovery shall be completed by 1/6/2020. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 3/2/2020. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM and the Jury Trial is SET for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 12/03 2:45 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by County of Sacramento. Attorney Cahill, Nicole Marie added. (Cahill, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 11/05 10:56 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/2/18 DISMISSING the City of Rancho Cordova. (Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/01 2:26 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Defendant City of Rancho Cordova by City of Rancho Cordova. Attorney Camy, William E. added. (Camy, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/17 8:51 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Rancho Cordova.(Fessenden, Carl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
8 8 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/20 12:24 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by County of Sacramento. (Longyear, Dayton)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/20 12:19 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento. Attorney Longyear, Dayton Van Vranken added.(Longyear, Dayton)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 08/17 2:41 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by City of Rancho Cordova. Attorney Fessenden, Carl L. added. (Fessenden, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/13 12:52 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Melissa Catherine Nold on behalf of N. M., Brigett McIntyre. (Nold, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for WBS Tue 06/26 2:55 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Tue 06/26 2:53 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Rancho Cordova, County of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John L. Burris* *Law Offices of John L. Burris* *7677 Oakport Street Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 06/26 1:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brigett McIntyre, N.M. (Nold, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/26 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by N.M., Brigett McIntyre. Attorney Nold, Melissa Catherine added. (Nold, Melissa)
Related: [-]
utility Civil Case Filing Fee Tue 06/26 2:04 PM
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-7735166. (Nold, Melissa)
Related: [-]