New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:18-cv-05821
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2018
Terminated:Sep 05, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Anthony Frodella
Plaintiff
Rapid Rim Repair LLC
Represented By
Philip Harold Kalban
Putney Twombly Hall & Hirson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2019
30 30 misc Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District Thu 10/24 4:00 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829103. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District Thu 10/24 3:59 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829094. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District Thu 10/24 3:58 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829067. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
misc Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District Issued Thu 10/24 4:24 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT ISSUED (3) on October 24, 2019, in favor of Rapid Rim Repair LLC, as against Anthony Frodella, in the amount of $256,111.70. Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party, at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, Room 105, Orders and Judgments. (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
27 27 order Judgment - Default Thu 09/05 11:54 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: It is: ORDERED, adjudged and decree: That the Plaintiff have judgment against defendants in the liquidated amount of $253,817.98 plus costs and disbursements of this action in the amount of$2,293.72, amounting in all to $256,111.70. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/5/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 08/06 12:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Docket #19, 22, 24-25 served on Anthony Frodella on 08/05/2019. Service was made by Mail and Federal Express. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/05 11:53 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT: It is: ORDERED that the above named defendant show cause before this Court at Courtroom 521 of the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York, on Sept. 5, 2019, at 10:30 o'clock in the AM, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why a judgment on default should not be issued and entered against defendant Anthony Frodella in the amount of $253,817.98 plus taxable costs in the amount of $2,293.72, and it is further,ORDERED that a copy of this order together with the papers on which it is granted be served on defendant on or before August 9, 2019, by mail and FedEx to defendant's place of business at Alloy Wheel Repair Specialists, LLC, 3375 West Oquendo Road, Las Vegas, NV 89118, and last known residence at 18 via Vasari, Henderson, NV 89011, as provided by defendant in the subject contract, and that such service shall be deemed good and sufficient. Further ordered that answering papers, if any, should be served upon Plaintiff by August 23, 2019. (Show Cause Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/5/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
24 24 misc Statement of Damages Tue 07/16 5:32 PM
STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs misc Statement of Damages Tue 07/16 4:21 PM
STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 07/16 3:11 PM
DECLARATION of Philip H. Kalban in Support re:15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to against Anthony Frodella .. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
21 21 misc Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation Tue 07/16 2:54 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against Anthony Frodella. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 7/30/2019(Kalban, Philip) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief Tue 07/16 2:54 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Default Judgment Tue 07/16 2:51 PM
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 07/16 3:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Philip Kalban to RE-FILE Document 21 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation,. ERROR(S): This form is used after Judgment has been entered, if you want to collect costs you should use the Statement of damages form on our website, and file it under Other Documents, as a Statement of damages. (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 07/16 3:45 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 20 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 07/16 3:45 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. 19 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
18 18 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/20 4:16 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Anthony Frodella. (km)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Thu 06/20 2:32 PM
AFFIRMATION of Philip H. Kalban in Support re:15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to against Anthony Frodella .. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/20 2:29 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default Judgment Thu 06/20 2:27 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to against Anthony Frodella . Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 04/09 5:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Anthony Frodella served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by John Doe- Employee. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
13 13 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 04/04 12:09 PM
CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for: Rule (16) conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, May 8, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 521, U.S. District Court, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing, at least five business days beforehand. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/4/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 03/07 10:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by John Doe- Employee. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 03/05 4:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Anthony Frodella served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was accepted by Datija Veal. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/04 4:44 PM
ORDER granting9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for service of the summons and complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Service due by 3/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/4/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/31 3:20 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for service of the summons and complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philip H. Kalban dated 01/31/2019. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. Return Date set for 3/4/2019 at 11:59 PM.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
8 8 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/17 3:22 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:7 Letter filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. The Rule 4(m) motion is due 1/31/19. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/17/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
7 7 misc Letter Wed 01/16 5:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philip H. Kalban dated 01/16/19 re: Unable to locate the defendant. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 08/22 12:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Anthony Frodella served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 06/28 11:47 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Frodella. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 06/28 11:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Harold Kalban. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,200,000; the County code has been modified to Orange. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 06/28 11:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 06/28 11:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 06/28 11:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/27 3:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Frodella, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/27 3:30 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/27 3:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/27 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Anthony Frodella. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15255604)Document filed by Rapid Rim Repair LLC.(Kalban, Philip)
Related: [-]