Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:18-cv-00356
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2018
Terminated:Mar 16, 2020
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
Concentra Health Services, Inc.
290 Branch Avenue
Providence, RI 02904
Represented By
Sheri L. Pizzi
Barton Gilman LLP
contact info
Kristen M. Whittle
Barton Gilman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Perry
Represented By
Edward C. Roy, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 16, 2020
18 18 misc Stipulation Mon 03/16 12:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Whittle, Kristen)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 03/16 3:38 PM
TEXT ORDER entering18 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 03/05 9:27 AM
TEXT ORDER denying as moot17 Motion to Compel- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/5/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 02/21 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 2/18/2020; counsel of record present (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Fri 01/17 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for Tuesday, 2/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Judge McConnell's Chambers. Counsel shall email a brief confidential settlement statement to barbara_barletta@rid.uscourts.gov on or before 2/14/20(Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/16 2:59 PM
Reset Deadlines: Re:17 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice Defendant's Response due by 3/3/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 12/16 8:26 AM
Reset Deadlines: Factual Discovery to close by 2/18/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/17/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/17/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 5/18/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/17/2020 (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/16 8:27 AM
Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to17 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice filed by Maria Perry Response due by 1/17/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
17 17 motion Compel Tue 12/03 4:26 PM
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice filed by Maria Perry. Responses due by 12/17/2019.(Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 10/22 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sheri L. Pizzi (Pizzi, Sheri)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 10/22 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Factual Discovery to close by 12/16/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/16/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 2/17/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 3/16/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 4/16/2020; NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/22/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
15 15 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/21 1:56 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to14 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Whittle, Kristen)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/21 9:06 AM
MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Maria Perry. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 05/21 12:04 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Factual Discovery to close by 7/26/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/26/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 9/26/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 10/28/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 11/27/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/21/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
13 13 motion Extension of Time Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/20 11:51 AM
MOTION for an Extension of Time enlarge time for completing discovery , MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Maria Perry. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 02/19 8:49 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ; Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Factual Discovery to close by 5/28/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/28/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/29/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 8/28/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/19/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/15 12:31 PM
Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Maria Perry. Responses due by 3/1/2019. (Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/06 12:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Whittle, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
10 10 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Tue 08/21 10:47 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 2/21/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/21/2019; Defendant 's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/22/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 5/22/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2019 So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/21/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
minutes Rule 16 Conference Tue 08/21 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 8/21/2018; Edward C. Roy, Jr. and Kristen Whittle participated (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
9 9 misc Rule 16 Statement Mon 08/20 8:41 AM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Maria Perry. (Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
8 8 misc Rule 16 Statement Fri 08/17 3:19 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Whittle, Kristen) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/17/2018) (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/07 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M. Whittle on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc. (Whittle, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Mon 08/06 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 8/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/30 4:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Concentra Health Services, Inc..(Pizzi, Sheri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/03 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Jackson, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
3 3 service Summons Request Mon 07/02 4:37 PM
Summons Request filed by Maria Perry. (Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Wed 06/27 4:16 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Wed 06/27 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1230378 ), filed by Maria Perry.(Roy, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/27 4:15 PM
Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]