Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Charles R Wolle
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:18-cv-00210
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2018
Terminated:Apr 15, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 3:32 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Kathryn LeAnn Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Steve Place
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Golden Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Steven Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret K. Heitkamp
Husch Blackwell Llp (wi)
contact info
Timothy H. Posnanski
Husch Blackwell Llp (wi)
contact info
Mollie Pawlosky
Dickinson Mackaman Tyler & Hagen PC
contact info
Defendant
Steve Place
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Defendant
Kathryn LeAnn Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Defendant
Golden Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Defendant
Steven Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Plaintiff
Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret K. Heitkamp
Husch Blackwell Llp (wi)
contact info
Timothy H. Posnanski
Husch Blackwell Llp (wi)
contact info
Mollie Pawlosky
Dickinson Mackaman Tyler & Hagen PC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
CGK M&A Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew E. Tanick
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mn)
contact info
Christine E. Bestor Townsend
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. (wi)
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Tom Kintis
Represented By
Andrew E. Tanick
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mn)
contact info
Christine E. Bestor Townsend
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. (wi)
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Kathryn LeAnn Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Steven Golden
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Golden Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Steve Place
Represented By
Matthew E Laughlin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Sarah K. Franklin
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info
Michael C. Richards
Davis Brown Law Firm (dsm)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 15, 2019
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/15 1:23 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (vr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
44 44 misc Stipulation Fri 04/12 10:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Parties by Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place. (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
43 43 order Closing Documents 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/11 4:38 PM
TEXT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: The parties have indicated this case has settled. Dkt.41 . Consequently, the trial, final pretrial conference and the status conference will be removed from the court's calendar. The parties shall file closing documents for the case by April 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/11/2019. (jeb)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Continue Mon 03/11 4:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting41 Joint Motion to Continue Status Conference. Given the parties' settlement of this case, the status conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/11/2019. (jeb)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Continue Mon 03/11 2:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference Hearing Scheduled for March 18, 2019 by Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 3/25/2019. (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/05 9:34 AM
TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference shall be held on March 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Counsel outside the Des Moines area may appear by telephone by calling 866-590-5055 and utilizing access code 8811585. Counsel should notify chambers prior to the conference if intending to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
39 39 order Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines Mon 01/14 5:06 PM
TEXT ORDER granting38 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines. Plaintiff Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc. shall designate expert witnesses and disclose their written reports by February 1, 2019. Defendants Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steven Golden, Kathryn LeAnn Golden and Steve Place shall designate expert witnesses and disclose their written reports by April 12, 2019. Expert witnesses supporting the counterclaims and third-party claims of Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steven Golden and Kathryn LeAnn Golden shall also be designated, and their written reports disclosed, by April 12, 2019. Plaintiff Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc. shall designate rebuttal expert witnesses and disclose their written reports by May 24, 2019. Third-Party Defendants Tom Kintis and CGK M&A Advisors, Inc. shall designate expert witnesses and disclose their written reports by May 24, 2019. Counterclaimants and Third-Party Plaintiffs Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steven Golden and Kathryn LeAnn Golden shall designate rebuttal expert witnesses and disclose their written reports by June 24, 2019. The parties shall file a status report after conclusion of their mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/14/2019. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
38 38 motion Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines Thu 01/10 10:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of all expert designations by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
37 37 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/20 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis re36 Answer to Counterclaim Answer to Amended Counterclaim of Steven Golden, Kathryn LeAnn Golden and Golden Enterprises, LLC (Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
36 36 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 12/20 3:16 PM
ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Answer to Amended Counterclaim of Steven Golden, Kathryn LeAnn Golden and Golden Enterprises, LLC by CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis.(Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
35 35 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Thu 12/20 1:36 PM
Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Answer to Amended Counterclaim of Steven Golden, Kathryn LeAnn Golden and Golden Enterprises, LLC by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc..(Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
34 34 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 4:34 PM
DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD PARTY Complaint by Matthew E Laughlin on behalf of Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place. (vr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
33 33 order Amend/Correct Fri 12/07 3:51 PM
TEXT ORDER granting32 Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Unresisted Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaim. Pursuant to Local Rule 15, the Clerk of Court is directed to detach and docket the amended pleading attached to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/7/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/07 3:37 PM
Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/21/2018.(Laughlin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
31 31 7 pgs order Order Wed 10/31 9:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/31/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order Setting Trial/FPT ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/31 9:43 AM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle, or as soon thereafter as it can be reached for trial. Estimated length 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 1:30 PM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/10/2018. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/10/2018. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/18/2019. Defendants' and Counterclaimants/Third-Party Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/29/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/10/2019. Third-Party Defendants' Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/10/2019. Counterclaimants/Third-Party Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/10/2019. Discovery Deadline 7/8/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/31/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
29 29 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/23 3:42 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2018. Attorneys Mollie Pawlosky & Timothy Posnanski appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Michael Richards & Sarah Franklin appeared for defendants. Attorney Christine Townsend appeared for third-party defendants. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 25 minutes. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
28 28 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/16 9:48 AM
TEXT ORDER RE FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: Any party seeking to file any documents under seal in this case first must file a motion requesting leave to do so. The documents sought to be filed under seal must not be attached to the motion or they will become part of the public case docket. Instead, the documents and purported confidential information therein must be described in the motion with sufficient particularity to enable the court to rule on the motion without reviewing the documents and determine whether public access should be prohibited. Leave to file under seal will be limited to only those specific documents or portions which purportedly disclose confidential information. Reasonable efforts must be made to redact such information to allow public filing of documents. Counsel for the moving party must confer in good faith with counsel for all other parties and state whether or not the other parties agree with sealing the documents and consent to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/16/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Protective Order Tue 10/16 9:45 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/16/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Protective Order Tue 10/16 9:43 AM
TEXT ORDER granting25 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The court approves and will enter a protective order in the form submitted by the parties with the exception of provisions related to the filing of documents under seal within paragraphs 6 and 10 which have been deleted as indicated. A separate order will be entered as to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/16/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
25 25 motion Protective Order Tue 10/09 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/23/2018.(Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
24 24 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Tue 10/09 3:53 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 08, 2018
23 23 service Certificate of Service Mon 10/08 9:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tom Kintis re22 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest Defendant,21 Answer to Third Party Complaint (Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Thu 10/04 9:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by CGK M&A Advisors, Inc.. (Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Thu 10/04 9:45 AM
Third Party Defendants' ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis.(Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/03 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Bestor Townsend on behalf of CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis (Townsend, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/02 1:50 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 23, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa, before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Counsel outside the Des Moines area may appear by telephone by calling 866-590-5055 and utilizing access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/2/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
18 18 order Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/26 9:10 AM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Extend Third Party Defendants' Time to Answer. As stipulated by the parties, the third party defendants shall have until October 5, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the third party complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 09/24 10:49 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Third Party Defendants' Time to Answer by CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis. (Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/21 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Tanick on behalf of CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis (Tanick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
15 15 order Extension of Time to File Thu 09/20 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit ProposedScheduling Order and Discovery Plan. As requested, the parties shall have until October 9, 2018, to submit their proposed Rule 16(b) and 26(f) scheduling order and discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/20/2018. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 09/19 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/3/2018. (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/18 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steven Golden. CGK M&A Advisors, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/18 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steven Golden. Tom Kintis served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Thu 09/06 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Golden Enterprises, LLC. (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 09/05 2:59 PM
ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Steven Golden, Kathryn LeAnn Golden and Golden Enterprises, LLC by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc..(Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/21 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K. Franklin on behalf of Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place (Franklin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/21 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Richards on behalf of Kathryn LeAnn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place (Richards, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/16 11:20 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Third-Party defendant 9/7/2018. Emailed CD packet and Third-party summons to counsel. (krn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Wed 08/15 4:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CGK M&A Advisors, Inc., Tom Kintis, COUNTERCLAIM against Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc. by Steve Place, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Kathryn LeAnn Golden.(Laughlin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/20 1:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.; Kathryn LeAnn Golden waiver served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018; Steven Golden waiver served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018; Golden Enterprises, LLC waiver served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018; Steve Place waiver served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF Wed 07/18 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
4 4 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/09 3:52 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy H. Posnanski; granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Margaret K. Heitkamp. Signed by Clerk of Court John Courter on 7/9/2018. (kjw)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Mon 07/09 11:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3539870 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.. (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Mon 07/09 11:10 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3539850 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.. (Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/02 2:24 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/20/2018. (krn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/27 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Kathryn Golden, Steven Golden, Golden Enterprises, LLC, Steve Place Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3531863., filed by Harrell's Car Wash Systems, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/25/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/25/2018.(Pawlosky, Mollie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A