County of Napa, California v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45750 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:18-cv-03374 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:06 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V. f/k/a Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novartis AG
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz International GmbH
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Napa, California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:49 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 143 pgs COMPLAINT with jury demand against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12417718.). Filed by County of Napa, California.(Baig, Aelish) Modified on 6/8/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by County of Napa, California (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Proposed Summons. (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Napa, California. (Baig, Aelish) Modified on 6/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/22/2018.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the court's web page at: www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-40)MDL 2804 IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/27/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-03374. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |