New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Case #: 1:18-cv-05861
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 25, 2018 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Eric Dym
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Frias
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Carlos Juan
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Mozdziak
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
Zain Woods
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
contact info
Defendant
"John Doe" #1 to 5
Plaintiff
Trey Boglin
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Stuvon Gethers
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Goodhope
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawkise Goodwin
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Jones
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharod Slater
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie Wilkins
Represented By
Richard A. Ashman
Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC
contact info
Eugene M. Bellin
Eugene M. Bellin
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
39 39 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 09/04 12:27 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF TREY BOGLIN WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties in this case, that, pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l){A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that: 1. All claims by plaintiff Trey Boglin are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. 2. This stipulation and Order is limited to the claims of Trey Boglin and shall not affect the claims of any other plaintiff in this lawsuit. SO ORDERED. Trey Boglin terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/4/2019) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
38 38 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 09/03 11:31 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Trey Boglin. (Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
37 37 order Stipulation and Order Tue 08/13 10:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, EXPENSES, AND COSTS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the respective parties to the above-captioned action, as follows: 1. Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiffs' counsel, Michelstein & Ashman, PLLC, the total sum of Twenty-Two Thousand Five Hundred ($22,500.00) Dollars in full satisfaction of plaintiffs' claims for attorney's foes, expenses, and costs, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Judgment Tue 08/13 10:45 AM
JUDGMENT ENTERED UNDER F.R.C.P. RULE 68: IT IS ADJUDGED that: 1. Plaintiff Sharod Slater have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Sharod Slater to March 27, 2019; and. 2. Plaintiff Shawkise Goodwin have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Shawkise Goodwin to March 27, 2019; and 3. Plaintiff Stuvon Gethers have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Stuvon Gethers to March 27, 2019; and 4. Plaintiff Mark Goodhope have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Mark Goodhope to March 27, 2019; and 5. Plaintiff Henry Jones have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Henry Jones to March 27, 2019; and 6. Plaintiff Jamie Wilkins have judgment against The City of New York in the sum of $5,001.00, plus reasonable attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred by plaintiff Jamie Wilkins to March 27, 2019. (Party Shawkise Goodwin, Henry Jones, Sharod Slater, Jamie Wilkins, Stuvon Gethers and Mark Goodhope terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2019) (jwh) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jwh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 08/12 7:13 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 32 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment 33 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Mon 08/12 7:13 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 34 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 08/12 7:15 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 29 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment 30 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment 31 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment 28 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
35 35 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 08/09 5:40 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Stuvon Gethers, Mark Goodhope, Shawkise Goodwin, Henry Jones, Sharod Slater, Jamie Wilkins. (Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 08/09 5:37 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Re: Document No.29 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment,32 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment,30 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment,33 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment,31 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment,28 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. Document filed by Stuvon Gethers, Mark Goodhope, Shawkise Goodwin, Henry Jones, Sharod Slater, Jamie Wilkins. (Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Jamie Wilkins.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
32 32 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Henry Jones.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
31 31 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Mark Goodhope.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
30 30 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Stuvon Gethers.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
29 29 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Shawkise Goodwin.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
28 28 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 08/09 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Sharod Slater.(Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 06/26 11:57 AM
ORDER granting26 THIRD LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen M. Suhovsky dated 6/25/19. Document filed by City of New York, Eric Dym (in His Individual Capacity), et al. So ordered. The status conference is adjourned from June 26, 2019 to September 3, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. (Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/26/2019) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
26 26 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 06/25 2:18 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen M. Suhovsky dated 6/25/19. Document filed by City of New York, Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity).(Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 05/06 5:22 PM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The status conference is adjourned from May 8, 2019 to June 26, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. (Status Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/6/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 05/06 1:22 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference joint request addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen Suhovsky dated 5/6/2019. Document filed by City of New York, Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity).(Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/02 5:19 PM
ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for May 8, 2019 at 9:45 am. (Status Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/2/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/02 5:17 PM
ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for May 8, 2019 at 9:45 am. (Status Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/2/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 12/12 12:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/12/2018. Plaintiff Counsel: Eugene Bellin; Defense Counsel: Stephen Suhovsky and Court Reporter present. The subsequent conference is scheduled for May 8, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. (Vega, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
adr Mediator Session Held Mon 12/10 4:32 PM
Mediator Session Held on 12/06/18 at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 11/09 10:38 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference is adjourned to December 12, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/9/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
19 19 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 11/08 3:16 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen M. Suhovsky dated 11/8/18. Document filed by City of New York, Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity).(Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
adr Mediator Session Scheduled Tue 11/06 10:03 AM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 12/06/18, 10 A.M. at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 10/30 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator.(mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
adr Section 1983 Plan 100-Day Review Thu 10/11 5:05 PM
LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Rule and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within ten (10) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 1/19/2019. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/22/2018.(mf)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Selection for Mediation Thu 10/11 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(mf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/09 6:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity).(Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/09 6:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Matthew Suhovsky on behalf of Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity). (Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 09/05 10:28 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity) served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018; Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity) served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. Service was accepted by Sgt. Kaloudis. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 08/13 5:32 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Discovery: The conference is adjourned to November 14, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/13 5:33 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (jwh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
13 13 motion Discovery Fri 08/10 3:56 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery Joint request for designation of case under Local Civil Rule 83.10 plan addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen Suhovsky dated 8/10/2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/31 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity) served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018; Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity) served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. Service was accepted by Marie Maccheroni, Clerk. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/31 10:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity) served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018; Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity) served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service was accepted by Sgt. Hernandez. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/30 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Matthew Suhovsky on behalf of City of New York. (Suhovsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 07/26 7:11 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity) served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018; Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity) served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service was accepted by Sergeant Singh. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/24 8:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity) served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity) served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service was accepted by SPAA Wing. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 07/19 1:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. City of New York served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras, clerk. Document filed by Jamie Wilkins; Shawkise Goodwin; Sharod Slater; Trey Boglin; Stuvon Gethers; Mark Goodhope; Henry Jones. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 07/09 12:38 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/9/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 06/29 4:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity). (laq)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 06/29 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard A. Ashman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 06/29 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard A. Ashman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York; "John Doe" #1 to 5; "John Doe" #1 to 5. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 06/29 9:59 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 06/29 10:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 06/29 10:00 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
15 15 adr Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan Tue 08/14 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/28 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene M. Bellin on behalf of Trey Boglin, Stuvon Gethers, Mark Goodhope, Shawkise Goodwin, Henry Jones, Sharod Slater, Jamie Wilkins. (Bellin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/28 3:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Eric Dym, Miguel Frias, Zain Woods, Matthew Mozdziak and Ronald Carlos Juan, re:1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Trey Boglin, Stuvon Gethers, Mark Goodhope, Shawkise Goodwin, Henry Jones, Sharod Slater, Jamie Wilkins. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/28 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/28 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe(#1 to 5 in Their Official Capacities), John Doe(#1 to 5 in Their Individual Capacities), Eric Dym(in His Individual Capacity), Eric Dym(in His Official Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Individual Capacity), Miguel Frias(in His Official Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Individual Capacity), Ronald Carlos Juan(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Official Capacity), Matthew Mozdziak(in His Individual Capacity), The City of New York, Zain Woods(in His Individual Capacity), Zain Woods(in His Official Capacity). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15261677)Document filed by Jamie Wilkins, Shawkise Goodwin, Sharod Slater, Trey Boglin, Stuvon Gethers, Mark Goodhope, Henry Jones.(Ashman, Richard)
Related: [-]