District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Paul L Friedman
Referred: S Martin Teel, Jr
Case #: 1:18-cv-01551
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2018
Terminated:Mar 23, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 25, 2018 3:19 AM EST
Defendant
MARK T. ESPER
Represented By
Jeremy Allen Haugh
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr.
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By
Jeremy Allen Haugh
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr.
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
LUCAS CALIXTO
Represented By
Joseph J. LoBue
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Jennifer M. Wollenberg
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TOUNDE DJOHI
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WANJING LI
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ZEYUAN LI
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FANG LU
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JINGQUAN QU
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HEMBASHIMA SAMBE
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EMEKA UDEIGWE
Represented By
Douglas W. Baruch
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info

GPO May 16 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 68 defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and 78 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 16, 2019. (lcesh1)
GPO Jun 03 2021
ORDER granting 179 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their third amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint on or before June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 3, 2021. (lcan)
GPO Jun 03 2021
OPINION granting 179 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their third amended complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 3, 2021. (lcan)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 09, 2022
258 258 misc Transcript Fri 12/09 2:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF FAIRNESS HEARING before Judge Paul L. Friedman, held on 09/21/2022. Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: 12/09/2022. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2023.(Wick, Sara)
Related: [-]