Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James M Carr
Case #: 1:18-ap-50125
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2018
Terminated:Oct 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc.
3854 Broadmoor Avenue SE Suite 101
Grand Rapids, MI 49512
Represented By
SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Meredith R. Theisen
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, May 26, 2023
12 12 misc Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of Fri 05/26 5:33 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Defendant SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC) Fri 10/12 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 290540. (TW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
11 11 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/05 1:49 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50125] Closed. (lak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
10 10 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 10/03 3:15 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/03/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (298892)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
9 9 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Thu 09/27 11:54 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by James P Moloy, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
8 8 court Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc. Fri 09/14 10:51 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 10/3/2018 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/14 1:42 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Defendant SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc Related [+]. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-] 1
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 08/14 1:40 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Defendant SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 08/14 1:38 PM
Appearance filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Defendant SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Thu 07/05 1:44 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc Related [+]. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, June 29, 2018
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Fri 06/29 2:47 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/13/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 7/30/2018. (lak)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Fri 06/29 12:28 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/29 12:27 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50125 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) SEI, Inc. d/b/a Service Express, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 Related [+]], [13]. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer