Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-15603

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:18-ap-01314
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2018
Terminated:Jun 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
PNC Bank
300 Fifth Avenue The Tower at PNC Bank
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
PNC Bank
contact info
Defendant
The United States of America
United States Attorney Peter Rodino Federal Building 970 Broad Street, Suite 700
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
The United States of America
contact info
Defendant
811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc.
811 Willow Avenue
Hoboken, NJ 07030
Represented By
811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC
One Tower River Square
Hartford, CT 06183
Represented By
Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
New Jersey Title Insurance Company
400 Lanidex Plaza 2nd Floor
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
New Jersey Title Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Mejia
722-724 Adams Avenue
Elizabeth, NJ 07201
Represented By
Patricia Mejia
contact info
Defendant
William Mejia
722-724 Adams Avenue
Elizabeth, NJ 07201
Represented By
William Mejia
contact info
Defendant
Oradell Animal Hospital
580 Winters Avenue
Paramus, NJ 07652
Represented By
Oradell Animal Hospital
contact info
Defendant
State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance
20 West State Street P.O. Box 325
Trenton, NJ 08625
Represented By
State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance
contact info
Defendant
State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission
P.O. Box 160
Trenton, NJ 08666
Represented By
State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Couch Andreottis
386 Brownstone Court
Wyckoff, NJ 07481
Represented By
Melissa Couch Andreottis
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
66 Route 17 North, First Floor
Paramus, NJ 07652
Represented By
Kim R. Lynch
Forman Holt
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Wed 06/09 9:58 AM
Receipt of Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 542890. Related [+]. Fee received from Forman Law (dlr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, June 20, 2019
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 06/20 10:19 AM
Adversary Case (2:18-ap-1314) Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
36 36 misc Stipulation Fri 02/22 11:24 AM
Stipulation Between Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant, PNC Bank, re:Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
court Hearing Held Tue 02/05 8:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Stipulation to dismiss to be submitted Related [+] (mg)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, February 01, 2019
35 35 misc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/01 1:19 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance, State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission and Melissa Couch Andreottis filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 01/22 4:03 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 1/22/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mg)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Monday, January 07, 2019
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 01/08 2:24 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: New Jersey Title Insurance Company 400 Lanidex Plaza 2nd Floor Parsippany, NJ 07054-2722 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 30 Default Judgment
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 01/08 2:27 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: New Jersey Title Insurance Company 400 Lanidex Plaza 2nd Floor Parsippany, NJ 07054-2722 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 29 Judgment
Friday, January 04, 2019
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 01/05 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 01/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
33 33 misc General Order - Shutdown 2018 Mon 12/31 11:42 AM
GENERAL ORDER INCORPORATING BY REFERENCE STANDING ORDER 18-4 OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY AS APPLIED TO BANKRUPTCY CASES AND ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS. All litigation in a bankruptcy case or adversary proceeding pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey involving as a party the United States of America, its agencies, and/or any other party represented by the Department of Justice or the United States Attorneys Office is immediately suspended, and held in abeyance continuing either (1) until the federal government is funded through congressional appropriation, or (2) for a period of 30 days from the date of the District Court Standing Order 18-4, whichever comes sooner. This Order includes as to the United States, the Department of Justice, or the U.S. Attorneys Office, the suspension of all pending deadlines to file proofs of claim, objections to: discharge, dischargeability, and confirmation of cases under Chapter 11 or Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code for this period. Notice of the entry of this order under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9022 has been given to the following parties in this case: All registered efiling attorneys, self-represented debtors (if this is a bankruptcy case,) or self-represented plaintiffs and defendants (if this is an adversary proceeding.) Please see the Court's website, njb.uscourts.gov for more information as it becomes available.. (jml)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/22 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 12/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/22 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 12/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
30 30 order Default Judgment Wed 12/19 3:33 PM
Final Judgment by Default Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital. Related [+]. Oradell Animal Hospital; Patricia Mejia and William Mejia terminated. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/19/2018 (zlh)
Related: [-] 13 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
29 29 order Judgment Wed 12/19 3:30 PM
Consent Judgment Avoiding Lien of Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC. Related [+].. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/19/2018 (zlh)
Related: [-] 27 Certificate of Consent filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
28 28 misc Change of Address Tue 12/18 3:07 PM
Change of Address for New Jersey Title Insurance Company From: 400 Lanidex Plaza, 2nd Fl, Parsippany, NJ 07054 To: 2001 US Route 46, Suite 310, Parsippany, NJ 07054 filed by William J. Levant on behalf of New Jersey Title Insurance Company. (Levant, William)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 12/18 1:59 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME:Request for Default Granted Related [+] (zlh)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 12/18 3:40 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/18/2018 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 01/22/2019 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Monday, December 17, 2018
27 27 misc Certificate of Consent Mon 12/17 12:18 PM
Certificate of Consent. Filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 12/18 12:58 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: New Jersey Title Insurance Company 400 Lanidex Plaza 2nd Floor Parsippany, NJ 07054-2722 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 23 Consent Order filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, December 13, 2018
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/13 11:50 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Request to Enter Default Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Kim R. Lynch in Support # 2 Proposed Entry of Default) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee,14 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles M. Forman in Support # 2 Proposed Default Judgment) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee,17 Entry of Default against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital (related document:13 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee) The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendants. (zlh),18 Notice of Hearing for:(related document:14 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendants.Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh) (served via us mail) Modified on 11/26/2018 (zlh).) filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 12/12 5:29 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Melissa Couch Andreottis 386 Brownstone Court Wyckoff, NJ 07481-2430 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 23 Consent Order filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, December 06, 2018
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 12/10 11:20 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Patricia Mejia 722-724 Adams Avenue Elizabeth, NJ 07201-1633 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 16 Entry of Default
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 12/10 11:21 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Patricia Mejia 722-724 Adams Avenue Elizabeth, NJ 07201-1633 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 17 Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/06 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 12/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
24 24 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 12/03 3:00 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 12/18/2018 AT 10:00 AM. . Related [+] (mg)
Related: [-] Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 12/03 3:02 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/4/18 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mg)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, November 30, 2018
23 23 order Consent Order Mon 12/03 10:50 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AVOIDING LIEN OF NEW JERSEY TITTLE INSURANCE COMPANY Related [+]
Related: [-] 22 Certificate of Consent (Adversary) filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/30/2018 (mg
22 22 misc Certificate of Consent Fri 11/30 11:25 AM
Certificate of Consent. Filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/29 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/29 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/28 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-] 17 Entry of Default
Monday, November 26, 2018
18 18 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Mon 11/26 3:57 PM
Notice of Hearing for Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendants .Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh) (served via us mail) Modified on 11/26/2018 (zlh)
17 17 court Entry of Default Mon 11/26 3:55 PM
Entry of Default against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendants. (zlh)
Related: [-] 13 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
16 16 court Entry of Default Mon 11/26 3:50 PM
Entry of Default against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital. Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. (zlh) INCORRECT PDF/ PLEASE DISREGARG Modified on 11/26/2018 (zlh)
Related: [-] 13 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/26 10:16 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-] 13 Request to Enter Default Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Kim R. Lynch in Support # 2 Proposed Entry of Default) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee,14 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles M. Forman in Support # 2 Proposed Default Judgment) filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee
14 14 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Mon 11/26 9:44 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Charles M. Forman in Support
Att: 2 Proposed Default Judgment
13 13 misc Request to Enter Default Mon 11/26 9:41 AM
Request to Enter Default Against Patricia Mejia, William Mejia and Oradell Animal Hospital filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Kim R. Lynch in Support
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
court Notice of Docketing Error Mon 11/26 3:53 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing .. Type of Error: INCORRECT PDF FILED, filed by THE COURT. THE COURT TO FILE CORRECT PDF (zlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
12 12 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 09/28 12:00 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 12/4/2018 @ 2:00 pm. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 09/28 12:01 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 10/2/2018 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/04/2018 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/07 11:44 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Eamonn O'Hagan on behalf of The United States of America. (O'Hagan, Eamonn)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint filed by Eamonn O'Hagan on behalf of The United States of America. (O'Hagan, Eamonn) filed by Defendant The United States of America
Monday, August 06, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/06 3:51 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eamonn O'Hagan on behalf of The United States of America. (O'Hagan, Eamonn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/02 12:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Denise E. Carlon on behalf of PNC Bank. (Carlon, Denise)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint filed by Denise E. Carlon on behalf of PNC Bank. filed by Defendant PNC Bank
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/01 5:08 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Denise E. Carlon on behalf of PNC Bank. (Carlon, Denise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/31 5:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Service on 811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc. Answer due on 8/1/2018; Melissa Couch Andreottis Answer due on 8/1/2018; Patricia Mejia Answer due on 8/1/2018; William Mejia Answer due on 8/1/2018; New Jersey Title Insurance Company Answer due on 8/1/2018; Oradell Animal Hospital Answer due on 8/1/2018; PNC Bank Answer due on 8/1/2018; State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance Answer due on 8/1/2018; State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission Answer due on 8/1/2018; The United States of America Answer due on 8/1/2018; Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC Answer due on 8/1/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/2/2018 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (smz) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018 (smz).
Friday, July 27, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/27 2:15 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Scott Aaron Levin on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC. (Levin, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement
Friday, July 06, 2018
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/06 1:20 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by William J. Levant on behalf of New Jersey Title Insurance Company. (Levant, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 02, 2018
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 07/02 12:43 PM
Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Service on 811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc. Answer due on 8/1/2018; Melissa Couch Andreottis Answer due on 8/1/2018; Patricia Mejia Answer due on 8/1/2018; William Mejia Answer due on 8/1/2018; New Jersey Title Insurance Company Answer due on 8/1/2018; Oradell Animal Hospital Answer due on 8/1/2018; PNC Bank Answer due on 8/1/2018; State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance Answer due on 8/1/2018; State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission Answer due on 8/1/2018; The United States of America Answer due on 8/1/2018; Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC Answer due on 8/1/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/2/2018 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (smz) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018 (smz)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Docketing Error Mon 07/02 8:41 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: FORM IS BLANK, filed by COURT. Please correct and refile with the court. (smz)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, June 29, 2018
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 06/29 4:53 PM
Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Service on 811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc. Answer due on 7/30/2018; Melissa Couch Andreottis Answer due on 7/30/2018; Patricia Mejia Answer due on 7/30/2018; William Mejia Answer due on 7/30/2018; New Jersey Title Insurance Company Answer due on 7/30/2018; Oradell Animal Hospital Answer due on 7/30/2018; PNC Bank Answer due on 7/30/2018; State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance Answer due on 7/30/2018; State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission Answer due on 7/30/2018; The United States of America Answer due on 7/30/2018; Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC Answer due on 7/30/2018 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/2/2018 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (smz) [ENTERED IN ERROR] Modified on 7/2/2018 (smz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Thu 06/28 3:17 PM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/28 3:10 PM
Adversary case 18-01314 Complaint by Charles M. Forman, as Chapter 7 Trustee against PNC Bank ; The United States of America ; 811 Willow Avenue Condominium Association, Inc. ; Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Inc., Assignee of Five Star Funding LLC ; New Jersey Title Insurance Company ; Patricia Mejia ; William Mejia ; Oradell Animal Hospital ; State of New Jersey Commissioner of Banking and Insurance ; State of New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission ; Melissa Couch Andreottis. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Lynch, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons