Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 2:18-cv-00522
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2018
Terminated:Sep 14, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 26, 2018 2:13 AM MST
Defendant
Housing Authority Salt Lake County
Represented By
James H. Deans
contact info
Defendant
DewBury Homes
Represented By
James H. Deans
contact info
Plaintiff
Charie Clifford
and on behalf of I.F., a minor 529 W 7300 S
MIDVALE, UT 84047

GPO Jul 31 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 Amended Complaint filed by Charie Clifford. It is recommended that the district judge DISMISS the complaint, in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/31/2021. (las)
GPO Jul 31 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 58 MOTION filed by Charie Clifford. It is recommended that the district judge TERMINATE in part and DENY in part Ms. Clifford's Motion 58. The parties must file any objection to this Report and Recommendation within fourteen (14) daysof service thereof. Id. Failure to object may constitute waiver of objections upon subsequentreview. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/31/2021. (las)
GPO Jan 11 2022
ORDER Overruling Objection and Adopting 60 61 Reports and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/11/22. (dla)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
83 83 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 03/17 7:44 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to 76 Notice of Appeal filed by Charie Clifford. According to the USCA the Order and Judgment of the USDC for the Dist of UT is AFFIRMED. Judgment included with mandate: Yes.. (jl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mandate cover letter