California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:18-cv-05741
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2018
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 26, 2018 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Alex Azar
Represented By
Andrew Brenner Insenga
U S Department Of Justice
contact info
Sherry Denise Soanes
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Benjamin M Moss
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Marina C Stevenson
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
E. Scott Lloyd
Represented By
Andrew Brenner Insenga
U S Department Of Justice
contact info
Sherry Denise Soanes
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Benjamin M Moss
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Marina C Stevenson
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaime D.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriela N.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Lucas R.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Angel S.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
San Fernando Valley Refugee Children Center, Inc.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniela Marisol T.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Unaccompanied Central American Refugee Empowerment
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Mary Kathryn Kelley
Cooley LLP
contact info
Megan L Donohue
Cooley LLP
contact info
Poonam Juneja
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Neha Desai
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Crystal Adams
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carter C White
Uc Davis Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Summer J Wynn
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Holly S Cooper
Uc Davis School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin F.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sirena P.
Represented By
Freya E K Pitts
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Leecia Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Carlos Holguin
Center For Human Rights And Constitutional Law
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
467 467 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 04/23 12:02 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE HEARING by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation466 as follows: Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Awarding them Attorneys' Fees and Other Expenses under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. Section 2412(d)455 by 5/30/2025. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion by 6/27/2025. The hearing is continued to 7/11/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
466 466 stip Continue Thu 04/17 9:32 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue briefing and hearing on Plaintiffs motion for an order awarding them attorneys fees and other expenses under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) (ECF No. 455) Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(D) 455 filed by Defendant Becerra Xavier.(Ross, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order