Caruso v. Property Solutions, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50140 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Property Solutions, Inc.
323 New Albany Road
Moorestown, NJ 08057 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Thu 08/15 1:28 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial15 . Joint stipulation of dismissal filed 4/26/19. Hearing vacated. (hmb) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Thu 05/16 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291630. (TW) |
||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/07 11:30 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50140] Closed. (lak) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Fri 04/26 4:22 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael Peek, John C. Hoard on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant Property Solutions, Inc. (Hoard, John) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Fri 02/22 1:28 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Discovery Requests filed by Michael Peek, John C. Hoard on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Hoard, John) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/13 3:14 PM
Order Following 12/12/2018 Status Conference, Deeming Answer to be Amended, Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Exhibit List due by 9/3/2019. Witness List due by 9/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Stipulations due by 9/9/2019. Trial date set on 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Trial time allotted is 1/2 day. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301703)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (299768)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 10/04 4:18 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/03/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (298900)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 09/14 11:22 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 10/3/2018 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 09/07 9:17 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Michael Peek on behalf of Defendant Property Solutions, Inc. (Peek, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 09/06 4:20 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 9/20/2018. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/05 8:40 AM
Appearance filed by Michael Peek on behalf of Defendant Property Solutions, Inc. (Peek, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/05 8:31 AM
Appearance filed by Michael Peek on behalf of Defendant Property Solutions, Inc. (Peek, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/04 3:23 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Michael Peek on behalf of Defendant Property Solutions, Inc . (Peek, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 09/04 3:20 PM
Appearance filed by Michael Peek on behalf of Defendant Property Solutions, Inc. (Peek, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Fri 07/06 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, INC . (Hoard, John) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 07/02 1:54 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/16/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/1/2018. (lak) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 06/29 1:58 PM
Appearance filed by John C. Hoard on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Hoard, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/29 1:57 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50140 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Property Solutions, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hoard, John) |