Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-11372

Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:18-ap-01100
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2018
Terminated:Sep 04, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bassam H Farhat
2929 S 356th PL
Federal Way, WA 98003
Represented By
Bassam H Farhat
contact info
Defendant
Salma A Farhat, husband and wife
2929 S 356th PL
Federal Way, WA 98003
Represented By
Salma A Farhat
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Webb
9526 180th Ave E
Bonney Lake, WA 98391
Represented By
David M Newman
The Rainier Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Webb
9811 192nd Ave E
Bonney Lake, WA 98391
Represented By
David M Newman
The Rainier Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Webtech Holdings Inc
9526 180th Ave E
Bonney Lake, WA 98391
Represented By
David M Newman
The Rainier Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
order Close Adversary Tue 09/04 3:18 PM
CLOSED. Adversary Case 2:18-ap-1100 Closed . (PBR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
court Minutes - Hearing Held Tue 08/21 7:05 AM
Minutes: Related [+] Agreed Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint Objecting to Discharge of Debts entered 08/09/2018; hearing scheduled 08/24/2018 is stricken. (SDU)
Related: [-] 4 Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case filed by David M Newman on behalf of Matthew Webb, Steven Webb, Webtech Holdings Inc
Saturday, August 11, 2018
9 9 misc BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/11 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Thursday, August 09, 2018
8 8 order Dismissing Adversary Case (order) Thu 08/09 10:33 AM
Agreed ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint Objecting to Discharge of Debts Related [+] Case Can Close: 8/30/2018. . (PBR)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
7 7 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Tue 08/07 4:02 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/06 1:55 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Jamie J McFarlane on behalf of Bassam H Farhat, Salma A Farhat. (McFarlane, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
5 5 ans Declaration Fri 07/27 1:19 PM
Plaintiff's Declaration of service of motion and notice of hearing Related [+]. Proof of Service. Filed by David M Newman on behalf of Matthew Webb, Steven Webb, Webtech Holdings Inc. (Newman, David)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Case Fri 07/27 10:28 AM
Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case with Notice of Hearing. Filed by David M Newman on behalf of Matthew Webb, Steven Webb, Webtech Holdings Inc The Hearing date is set for 8/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 8106. Response due by 8/17/2018. (Newman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Notice of Hearing
Monday, July 09, 2018
3 3 misc Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 07/09 4:55 PM
Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing . Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (Tacoma) Thu 07/05 7:10 AM
Summons issued to Plaintiff's Attorney for Service on Defendants Bassam H Farhat Answer Due 8/6/2018; Salma A Farhat Answer Due 8/6/2018 (original summons provided via email confirmation). (SDU)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 07/02 6:14 PM
Adversary case 18-01100 Complaint by Steven Webb (attorney David M Newman), Matthew Webb (attorney David M Newman), Webtech Holdings, Inc. (attorney David M Newman) against Bassam H Farhat, Salma A Farhat. . Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Newman, David) Modified on 7/3/2018 (VAB)
Related: [-]