Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:18-cr-01605
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jul 06, 2018 2:41 AM CDT
Defendant
David Pablo Santiago (1)
Represented By
Andrew Lafayette Steed
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Whyte
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/06/2018 2:55 AM CDT
Thursday, May 10, 2018
Arrest of David Pablo Santiago (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND SET as to David Pablo Santiago by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to David Pablo Santiago. (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to David Pablo Santiago. (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to David Pablo Santiago. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to David Pablo Santiago held on 5/10/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to David Pablo Santiago (Court Reporter ERO.) (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to David Pablo Santiago, ( Detention Hearing set for 5/15/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,, Preliminary Hearing set for 5/15/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Lafayette Steed appearing for David Pablo Santiago . Attorney Andrew Lafayette Steed added to party David Pablo Santiago(pty:dft) (Steed, Andrew) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
7 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant as to David Pablo Santiago. No Signature. Attorney Andrew Lafayette Steed(mg2) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Rose Whyte appearing for USA. . Attorney Michael Rose Whyte added to party USA(pty:pla) (Whyte, Michael) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Lafayette Steed appearing for David Pablo Santiago CORRECTED (Steed, Andrew) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
10 10 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by David Pablo Santiago (Steed, Andrew) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to David Pablo Santiago. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mm1) [3:18-mj-03150-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
Related: [-]
12 12 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to David Pablo Santiago (1) count(s) 1. (mn)
Related: [-] dacted Version
14 14 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to David Pablo Santiago (mn)
Related: [-]