Worth County, Missouri v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45777 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 5:18-cv-06084 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Worth County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:54 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5812103. Service due by 9/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from mowd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from mowd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Gary A. Fenner, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 5 18-06084 CV-SJ-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from mowd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-41, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on 7/2/18. Case electronically transferred. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from mowd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western. Case number 5:18-cv-06084. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |