Bourbon County, Kansas v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45781 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kansas, 2:18-cv-02312 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Sandoz International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. n/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Bourbon County, Kansas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/26/2019 3:20 PM EST |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn) [Transferred from ksd on 7/5/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 151 pgs COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4506120.), filed by Bourbon County, Kansas.(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from ksd on 7/5/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Bourbon County, Kansas. (Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from ksd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn) [Transferred from ksd on 7/5/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Norther District of Ohio (MDL-2804). ***Terminating Case. (hw) [Transferred from ksd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 2:18-cv-02312. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |