County of Volusia, Florida v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45782 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 6:18-cv-00944 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Volusia, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 3:35 PM EST |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number ORL074499) filed by County of Volusia, Florida.(RDO) (RDO). [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 24 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 2, | ||
Att: 2 28 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 3, | ||
Att: 3 24 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 4, | ||
Att: 4 25 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 5, | ||
Att: 5 22 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 6, | ||
Att: 6 24 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 7, | ||
Att: 7 22 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 8, | ||
Att: 8 19 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 9, | ||
Att: 9 19 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 10, | ||
Att: 10 19 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 11, | ||
Att: 11 19 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 12, | ||
Att: 12 12 pgs (6/15/2018) Complaint part 13, | ||
Att: 13 (6/15/2018) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2804, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 6/15/18, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (RDO) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Complaint part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Comp. part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Comp. part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Comp. part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Comp. part 5, | ||
Att: 6 Comp. part 6, | ||
Att: 7 Comp. part 7, | ||
Att: 8 Comp. part 8, | ||
Att: 9 Comp. part 9, | ||
Att: 10 Comp. part 10, | ||
Att: 11 Comp. part 11, | ||
Att: 12 Comp. part 12, | ||
Att: 13 Comp. part 13, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 15 Docket Sheet | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/22/2018. (SC) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Case reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:18-cv-994-Orl-37KRS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/11/2018. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/27/2018.(CTP)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
6 | 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/11/2018. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/27/2018. (ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number: MDL-2804 (BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 7/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 6:18-cv-00944. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |