Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:09-bk-21481 |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2009 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 27, 2010 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 25, 2010 |
Converted: | Apr 12, 2010 |
Debtor
Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC
19950 W Country Club Dr
Aventura, FL 33180-4601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Creditors Committee
Genovese Joblove Battista, P.A.
c/o Paul J. Battista, Esq.
100 SE 2nd Street
Suite 4400
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.
1 Pierrepont Plaza 7th Fl
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
|
Cross-Claimant
Winter Composites, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RJF International Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Noticing / Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Trustee
Soneet Kapila
www.kapilatrustee.com
PO Box 14213
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave.
Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2018 12:45 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 09, 2009 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 09-21481 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5648152. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 40 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1039] (Baena, Scott) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC. (Baena, Scott) | |
3 | 3 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Scott L Baena Esq . (Baena, Scott) | |
6 | 6 Notice of Deficiency Summary of Schedules due 6/24/2009. Schedule A due 6/24/2009. Schedule B due 6/24/2009. Schedule D due 6/24/2009. Schedule E due 6/24/2009. Schedule F due 6/24/2009. Schedule G due 6/24/2009. Schedule H due 6/24/2009.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 6/24/2009.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 6/24/2009. [Incomplete Filings due by 6/24/2009]. (Gutierrez, Susan) |