Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James M Carr
Case #: 1:18-ap-50148
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2018
Terminated:Mar 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
AV Solutions LLC
1616 Farmhouse Drive
Westfield, IN 46074
Represented By
AV Solutions LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah J. Caruso
Chapter 7 Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Meredith R. Theisen
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth N. Hahn
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
20 20 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 03/14 10:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/13/2019, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (305728)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC) Thu 03/07 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291288. (TW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
19 19 court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/04 1:50 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50148] Closed. (lak)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
18 18 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Fri 02/15 11:45 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John R. Humphrey, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant AV Solutions LLC, Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
17 17 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 02/13 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/13/2019, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (304396)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 01/16 3:21 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/16/2019, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (303010)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
15 15 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301708)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
14 14 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Continued Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (299758)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
13 13 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 10/04 4:18 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/03/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (298890)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
12 12 court Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc. Fri 09/14 10:46 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 10/3/2018 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/13 1:00 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant AV Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Humphrey, John)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 07/24 2:31 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by John R. Humphrey, Michael P. O'Neil on behalf of Defendant AV Solutions LLC. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 07/24 10:04 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 8/7/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 07/24 10:03 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 8/7/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, July 23, 2018
7 7 notice Appearance Mon 07/23 3:01 PM
Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant AV Solutions LLC. (Humphrey, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Mon 07/23 2:58 PM
Appearance filed by Michael P. O'Neil on behalf of Defendant AV Solutions LLC. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Fri 07/13 11:37 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: AV Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Hahn, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, July 06, 2018
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Fri 07/06 9:54 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/20/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/6/2018. (lak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
3 3 notice Appearance Thu 07/05 2:21 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Thu 07/05 2:19 PM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/05 2:18 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50148 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah J. Caruso against Defendant(s) AV Solutions LLC (Fee deferred: $350) [12 Related [+]], [13]. (Hahn, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer