Caruso v. Agera Energy, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50168 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Agera Energy, LLC
555 Pleasantville Rd., Suite 107
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Tue 12/17 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 292702. (TW) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/03 3:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding 1:18-ap-50168 Closed. (lak) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Mon 11/25 4:02 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial25 . Stipulation of dismissal filed 11/25/19. Hearing vacated. (hmb) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 11/25 9:39 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit, Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC, Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Order on Motion to
Thu 09/12 3:56 PM
Order Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Continuing Trial . Exhibit List due by 12/23/2019. Witness List due by 12/23/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/9/2019. Trial date set on 1/30/2020 at 10:00 AM EST in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Attorney for Plaintiff Deborah Caruso must distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Motion to
Mon 09/09 8:27 AM
Agreed Motion to Continue Trial filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso . (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Authority, Motion for
Mon 09/09 8:25 AM
Agreed Motion for Authority to Extend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/20 1:21 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Trial date set on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Trial time allotted is one-half day. Exhibit List due by 9/23/2019. Witness List due by 9/23/2019. Dispositive Motions including Summary Judgment due by 9/9/2019. Stipulations due by 9/30/2019. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Wed 06/19 3:15 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference. Disposition: Status conference held. Trial to be held on 10/07/2019 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Court to issue scheduling order. (hmb) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Mon 05/13 9:54 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Complaint1 . Disposition: Status conference not held. Parties request that the status conference be continued to 06/19/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 04/17 12:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/17/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (306961)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 03/14 10:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (305729)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/13 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (304387)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/16 3:21 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/16/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (303016)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Fri 12/14 1:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Discovery . Time to file extended to 1/7/2019. Attorney for Defendant Agera Energy, LLC must distribute this order. (jam) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Thu 12/13 3:34 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Discovery filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC. (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301689)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Thu 11/15 10:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Discovery . Time to file extended to 12/17/2018. Attorney for Defendant Agera Energy, LLC must distribute this order. (hmb) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (299889)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Tue 11/13 2:52 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Discovery filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC. (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 10/05 2:03 PM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 11/14/2018 at 01:30 PM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 10/02 3:06 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC [Corporate Parent(s): AGH Parent, LLC, AGH Supplemental, LLC]. (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 10/02 7:52 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 10/16/2018. (lak) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/01 3:07 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC . (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 10/01 3:05 PM
Appearance filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Agera Energy, LLC. (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Fri 07/13 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Agera Energy, LLC . (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 07/06 12:26 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/20/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/6/2018. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/06 10:51 AM
Appearance filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/06 10:50 AM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50168 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Agera Energy, LLC (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |