Caruso v. Janitronics, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50177 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Janitronics, Inc.
1988 Central Avenue
Albany, NY 12205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Tue 04/09 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291453. (JS) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/04 3:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50177] Closed. (lak) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Sat 03/23 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/22/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 03/21 11:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/20/2019, MATTER: Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant9 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (306433)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
13 | 13
order
Default Judgment, Order on Motion for
Wed 03/20 2:58 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Janitronics, Inc . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Official Court Notice
Sat 03/09 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/08/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Official Court Notice
Thu 03/07 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/06/2019. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Wed 03/06 3:33 PM
Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion for Default Judgment . Hearing to be held on 3/20/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. (hmb) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Tue 03/05 7:35 AM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso . (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Mon 03/04 4:13 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment . Hearing to be held on 3/20/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. (hmb) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Mon 03/04 10:49 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 03/01 4:25 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Janitronics, Inc . (lak) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of
Fri 03/01 9:23 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk with Affidavit filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Fri 07/13 2:04 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Janitronics, Inc . (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 07/06 1:58 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/20/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/6/2018. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/06 12:16 PM
Appearance filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/06 12:15 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50177 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Janitronics, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Nielsen, Cassandra) |