Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-41188

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:18-ap-04072
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2018
Terminated:Nov 14, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Power Brothers Auto Center Inc
28 Main Street
Milford, MA 01757
Represented By
Power Brothers Auto Center Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee
Verdolino & Lowey, P.C. 124 Washington Street
Foxborough, MA 02035
Represented By
Joseph Steinfeld
contact info
Brigette G. McGrath
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 11/14 12:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 18-4072 Dismissed Complaint. (ab)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/14 12:50 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-4072 Closed. (ab)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
4 4 notice Notice Fri 10/26 12:47 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Craig R. Jalbert (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/10 3:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Power Brothers Auto Center Inc 7/10/2018 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 07/05 3:04 PM
Summons Issued on Power Brothers Auto Center Inc Answer Due 8/6/2018. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (dc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/05 1:20 PM
Adversary case 18-04072 Complaint by Craig R. Jalbert against Power Brothers Auto Center Inc. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet