California Central Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:18-ap-01220
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2018
Terminated:Nov 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Degma Investing, LLC
Represented By
Abigail V O'Brient
Mintz Levin
contact info
Defendant
The Parking Mall, L.L.C.
Represented By
Abigail V O'Brient
Mintz Levin
contact info
Defendant
LTAP1, LLC
Represented By
Abigail V O'Brient
Mintz Levin
contact info
Defendant
SDC Remainder LLC
Represented By
Abigail V O'Brient
Mintz Levin
contact info
Defendant
G.M.A. Industrial Corp.
Represented By
Abigail V O'Brient
Mintz Levin
contact info
Defendant
Mark Buntzman
Represented By
Mark Buntzman
contact info
Plaintiff
Stillwater Liquidating LLC
Represented By
Tony Tootell
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
75 75 court Transcript Tue 01/29 11:05 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/16/18 RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 04/29/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMPANY, INC., Telephone number 310-410-4151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/5/2019. Redaction Request Due By 02/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/1/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/29/2019. (Martens, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
74 74 misc Transcript Record Transmittal Fri 01/25 1:20 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 19-BB-03. RE Hearing Date: 10/16/18, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING, Telephone number 310-410-4151.] Related [+] (Tatum, Shafari)
Related: [-] 73 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Plaintiff Stillwater Liquidating LLC
Thursday, January 24, 2019
73 73 misc Transcript Order Form (Public Request) Thu 01/24 1:32 PM
Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 10/16/18 Filed by Plaintiff Stillwater Liquidating LLC. (Tootell, Tony)
Related: [-]