New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:18-cv-06154
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2018
Terminated:Feb 27, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 02, 2019 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff
Kim Stevenson
Represented By
Brett A. Emison
Langdon & Emison
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 17, 2022
58 58 order Protective Order Thu 02/17 2:15 PM
ORDER [Amending the Restrictions on Use of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information]. Defendants and Lead Counsel for plaintiffs having consented thereto, and for good cause shown, Order No. 10 Paragraph 7(a) (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No.2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italics) and as further set forth in this Order. In addition, Order No. 10 Paragraph 8 (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No. 2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italic) and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/17/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv)
Related: [-]