New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:18-cv-06171
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2018
Terminated:Oct 02, 2018
Last checked: Monday Aug 20, 2018 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Algamex Ltd.
Defendant
Vincent Andrews
Defendant
Alexis Arellano Bolivar
Defendant
PDVSA US Litigation Trust
Defendant
Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.
Defendant
Edward P Swyer
Plaintiff
Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V.
Represented By
Andrew David Wang
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marcus Johnson Green
Kobre & Kim, Llp (dc)
contact info
Melanie Lisa Oxhorn
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael Sangyun Kim
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited
Represented By
Andrew David Wang
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marcus Johnson Green
Kobre & Kim, Llp (dc)
contact info
Melanie Lisa Oxhorn
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael Sangyun Kim
Kobre & Kim Llp (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
25 25 1 pgs order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Wed 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the plaintiffs, by and through their counsel, give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/3/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
24 24 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Green, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew David Wang on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. New Address: Kobre & Kim LLP, 800 Third Avenue, New York, New York, United States of America 10022, 2124881200. (Wang, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
22 22 service Amended Summons Issued Tue 1:23 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Algamex Ltd.. (dnh)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 1:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Algamex Ltd, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Sangyun Kim to RE-FILE Document No. 20 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; for Summons requests previously issued to parties use the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons and reflect PDF as "Amended". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
20 20 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Algamex Ltd, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Mon 2:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (sj)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Mon 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexis Arellano Bolivar. (sj)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Mon 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward P Swyer. (sj)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Mon 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PDVSA US Litigation Trust. (sj)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 2:47 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent Andrews. (sj)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 2:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Algamex Ltd.. (sj)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew David Wang on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Wang, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 1:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Sangyun Kim. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexis Arellano Bolivar; Algamex Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 2:29 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Sangyun Kim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1602; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1330; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 2:38 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 2:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 2:39 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 2:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Sangyun Kim to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Name in "To" field must match exactly as it appears in caption (not alias). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Lisa Oxhorn on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Oxhorn, Melanie)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 9:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marcus Johnson Green on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Green, Marcus)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 9:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Conoco Orinoco Inc., Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Company for Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V.; Corporate Parent Hamaca Holding LLC, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., Corporate Parent Phillips Investment Company LLC, Corporate Parent Phillips Petroleum International Investment Company LLC, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Company for Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PDVSA US Litigation Trust, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward P. Swyer, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vincent Andrews, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Algamex Ltd., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Algamex Ltd., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Petroleos de Venezuela S.A., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 9:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexis Arellano Bolivar, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 9:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 9:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Algamex Ltd., Vincent Andrews, Alexis Arellano Bolivar, PDVSA US Litigation Trust, Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., Edward P Swyer. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15293732)Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 61 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 17 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 35 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 24 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 16 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 4 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 8 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 11 9 pgs Exhibit K