Hunt v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45681 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:18-cv-01349 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Hunt
1102 Glemsford Road Apt. B
Essex, MD 21221 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:01 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7320231.), filed by Shannon Hunt.(Gilman, Charles) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 (FILED IN ERROR) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Shannon Hunt as to All Defendants.(Geisser, Lauren) Modified on 5/14/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 QC NOTICE:2 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Shannon Hunt was filed incorrectly. ***Please file using the correct event>Other Filings>Notice(Other)and link it to the complaint. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
4 | 4 (FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE by Shannon Hunt re1 Complaint (Geisser, Lauren) Modified on 5/14/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
5 | 5 QC NOTICE:4 Notice (Other) filed by Shannon Hunt was filed incorrectly.***Please file a summons for each party on the case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE by Shannon Hunt re1 Complaint (Geisser, Lauren) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisource Bergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutials, Inc..(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Wussow (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7334859.) by Shannon Hunt(Geisser, Lauren) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Celeste Brustowicz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7334879.) by Shannon Hunt(Geisser, Lauren) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen Wussow. Directing attorney Stephen Wussow to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
11 | 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Celeste Brustowicz. Directing attorney Celeste Brustowicz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 6/8/2018.] | |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:18-cv-01349. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |